ChriMar Systems Inc. et al v. Cisco Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ChriMar Systems Inc and ChriMar Holding Company LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco Consumer Products LLC, Hewlett-Packard Co., 3COM Corporation, Extreme Networks, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01300
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER RE: 410 STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME OF RESCHEDULED SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING DATE SET IN DKT. NO. 405 IN VIEW OF TRIAL CONFLICT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/20/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 SECOND ORDER ADMONISHING PARTIES AND REQUIRING CERTIFICATION FROM PARTIES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/31/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 368 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ; AND 372 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Second Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/2/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER RESOLVING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL BRIEFS AND EXHIBITS RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/29/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER CLARIFYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEDURE AND PAGE LIMITS re 370 JOINT REQUEST OF THE PARTIES FOR CLARIFICATION OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/25/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Discovery Order re 287 Letter Brief filed by Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco Consumer Products LLC, Cisco-Linksys LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/21/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE 338 339 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, and Third Amended Counterclaims and Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Second Amended Counterclaims. Supplemental brief from Plaintiffs due by 4/13/2016 at 12:00 p.m. Supplemental Response from Defendants due by 4/15/2016 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 7, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER RELIEVING PARTIES OF THE OBLIGATION TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPIES OF REDACTED VERSIONS OF DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER GRANTING, IN PART, 343 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule and Briefing Limits. Motion hearing scheduled for May 20, 2016 vacated. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 21, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS TO SEAL RE: 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 316 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER GRANTING 292 MOTION For Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 325 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING RE 292 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/9/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER RE 293 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Responses to Order due by 1/26/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Discovery Order re: 298 Joint Discovery Letter; and 299 Joint Discovery Letter (redacted version), 300 Joint Discovery Letter (unredacted version). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Discovery Order re 289 Discovery Order, 306 Notice filed by ChriMar Systems Inc, ChriMar Holding Company LLC. ChriMar shall file Mr. Forbis's Declaration by 1/22/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/11/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 DISCOVERY ORDER re 287 Letter Brief. Plaintiffs to submit documents for in camera review and file declaration(s) by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/4/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER GRANTING 281 Motion for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER (1) ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND (2) SETTING DATES. Discovery due by 12/11/2015. Expert Witness List due by 3/11/2016. Jury Selection set for 8/17/2016 08:00 AM in Cour troom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 8/22/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/8/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/18/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER GRANTING 237 STIPULATION REGARDING LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/20/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE RE: 202 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Discovery Order re: Dkt. Nos. 207 , 208 , 217 , 218 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/5/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING 221 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on 202 Motion to Dismiss Defendants HP and Cisco's Monopolization and Section 17200 Counterclaims and HP's Attempted Monopolization Counterclaim. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 3, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 211 Stipulation to Enlarge Time for Filing of Defendants' Opposition and Filing of Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition re 202 Motion to Dismiss and CONTINUING hearing. Opposition due by 9/4/2014. Reply due by 9/15/2014. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 26, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Discovery Order re: 199 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ChriMar Document filed by Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco Consumer Products LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/25/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Discovery Order re: Joint Letter, Dkt. No. 199. ChriMar is ordered to submit the disputed email for in camera review by 8/15/2014. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/13/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Court's Proposed Claims Construction and Questions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 3, 2014. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 155 Discovery Letter Brief (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER RESERVING RULING ON MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 144 Discovery Letter Brief (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 FURTHER ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING 142 Stipulated Dismissal of Defendant Extreme Networks, Inc with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/26/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ChriMar Systems Inc. et al v. Cisco Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ChriMar Systems Inc
Represented By: Robert A. Auchter
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Frey
Represented By: Brandon Jordan
Represented By: Brandon M Jordan
Represented By: Benjamin Levi
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Lauren E. Maguire
Represented By: Joshua T. Morris
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Alice Suh
Represented By: Dirk D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ChriMar Holding Company LLC
Represented By: Robert A. Auchter
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Frey
Represented By: Brandon M Jordan
Represented By: Benjamin Levi
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Lauren E. Maguire
Represented By: Joshua T. Morris
Represented By: Courtland Lewis Reichman
Represented By: Alice Suh
Represented By: Dirk D. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc
Represented By: Harper Batts
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Michael W. De Vries
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Eric R. Lamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Consumer Products LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Co.
Represented By: David Dolkas
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Represented By: Raymond M. Gabriel
Represented By: Charles J. Hawkins
Represented By: Darryl J. Ong
Represented By: Robert J. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3COM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extreme Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco-Linksys LLC
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?