Brown et al v. Alexander et al

Plaintiff: Barry Brown and Jennifer Brown
Defendant: Jon Alexander, Dean Wilson, Ed Fleshman, Julie Cain, Cindy Salatnay, County of Del Norte and Donald Crockett
Case Number: 3:2013cv01451
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 179 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 178 Continuing Discovery Deadline, Pre-Trial Matters and Trial Date. Jury Selection set for 5/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 at 09: 00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/15/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 5, 2016 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 176 of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Barry Brown, Only. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 21, 2016 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR DISCOVERY HEARING: Re 168 Proposed Order filed by Ed Fleshman, Dean Wilson, Cindy Salatnay, Julie Cain, Jon Alexander, County of Del Norte. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall (1-866-582-6878). Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/21/2016. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
April 6, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/28/2016 09:30 AM. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 23, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler Granting 153 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
March 17, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER DISCOVERY ORDER: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 9:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/17/2016. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 3, 2016 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 121 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying their Motion to Dismiss the State Law Claims of Jane Does 1 and 2.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 18, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 128 Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Time to Respond and Denying the Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
January 14, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2016 at 11:00 AM to be held telephonic. Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2017 at 10:00 AM; Jury Selection/Trial set for 2/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
December 16, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING JOHN BURKE AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JANE DOE 1 & 2. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
December 10, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying defendants' 112 Motion to Strike (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 20, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO REMOVE GUARDIAN AD LITEM BARRY BROWN.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015) Modified on 11/20/2015 (cl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Hon. Samuel Conti no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
August 20, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Plaintiffs to Appear, re 85 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on August 20, 2015. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
May 12, 2015 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 15, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
December 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 31 Defendant Crockett's Motion for More Definite Statement; granting in part and denying in part 32 County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting 31 Defendant Crockett's Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
August 15, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 21 Donald Crocket's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 23 County's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
April 17, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem for Jane Doe 1 and Jane Doe 2. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/17/2013. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Alexander et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Brown
Represented By: Thomas Neil Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Brown
Represented By: Thomas Neil Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Fleshman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Salatnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Del Norte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?