Blue Growth Holdings Ltd v. Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Blue Growth Holdings Ltd |
Defendant: |
Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC and Joseph M. Aaron |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv01452 |
Filed: |
April 1, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
San Francisco |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles R. Breyer |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2014 |
Filing
97
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMS 96 . Judgment Debtor Exams as to Wood Hat & Silver Profit Sharing Plan, Wood Hat & Silver LLC, and Joseph M. Aaron are continued to 11/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom F's Attorney Conference Room, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/28/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
92
ORDER TO THIRD PARTY Joseph M. Aaron TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION RE: ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT RE: 88 . Judgment Debtor Exam set for 10/29/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/26/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
|
July 16, 2014 |
Filing
85
Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting 73 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014).
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing
77
ORDER, Reset DHearing as to 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff Blue Growth Holdings Ltd's Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs Against Defendants' Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC and Joseph M. Aaron . Motion granting 75 STIPULATION re 73 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiff Blue Growth Holdings Ltd's filed by Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC, Joseph M. Aaron. Motion Hearing reset for 7/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/15/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Amended Complaint, Stipulation to Dismiss Beth Aaron From the First Amended Complaint and to Dismiss Count III of the First Amended Complaint filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Beth Aaron terminated Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
|
September 4, 2013 |
Filing
42
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Plaintiff Blue Growth Holdings Ltd.s Deadline To File A Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Replies due by 6/25/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
|
May 31, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 15 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/31/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?