Torres v. City of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Israel Torres
Defendant: City of Santa Clara and Tony Parker
Case Number: 3:2013cv01475
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 4, 2014. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 2, 2014. (psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 [PROPOSED] PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 27, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting-in-part 40 , 41 , 42 , 43 , 44 , 45 , 46 , 51 , 52 , 53 , 54 and 55 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/8/13. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. City of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Torres
Represented By: Nicholas Garrett Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?