Smith v. Lux Retail North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Emily Smith
Defendant: Lux Retail North America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01579
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REMANDING ACTION FOR WANT OF JURISDICTION [re 22 Order, Set Deadlines, 23 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/13/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [re 20 First MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE ALL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN LUX RETAIL NORTH AMERICA, INC.S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Emily Smith]. The 6/13/2013 (8:00 AM) hearing will remain on calendar to address the issue of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/22/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 23, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Lux Retail North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lux Retail North America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Albrecht
Represented By: Lynne C. Hermle
Represented By: Julie Ann Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Smith
Represented By: Michael C Righetti
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Zachary Miles Crosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?