Eblovi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Plaintiff: David C. Eblovi and Monica K. Eblovi
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv01596
Filed: April 9, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due by 5/28/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/20/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/29/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 05/29/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 10, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 2 Motion for TRO; denying 2 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eblovi et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Eblovi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica K. Eblovi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Joseph Michael Galosic
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Represented By: Melissa Middleton Sgroi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.