Pardini v. Unilever United States, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kym Pardini
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01675
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 54 Motion to Stay (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Class Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 01/05/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Briefing Schedule on Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 03/31/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Approving 26 Stipulation filed by Unilever United States, Inc. to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/15/2013. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 13 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. The case management conference will be continued to a date after the Court rules on the pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 06/27/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pardini v. Unilever United States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kym Pardini
Represented By: Ureka Ellie Idstrom
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Represented By: William Lewis Stern
Represented By: Claudia Maria Vetesi
Represented By: Lisa Ann Wongchenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?