Ramirez v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Andres Ramirez, III
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv01688
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 17, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Supplemental Briefing on 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/17/16. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
March 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 22 Stipulation and Order for attorneys' fees under EAJA, filed by Andres Ramirez, III. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
January 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REMANDING CASE re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) filed by Carolyn W. Colvin, Motions terminated: 18 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Andres Ramirez, III, 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) filed by Carolyn W. Colvin.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Ramirez, III
Represented By: Cynthia Gail Starkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?