Saucedo v. Brazelton

Petitioner: Steven R. Saucedo, Jr
Respondent: P. D. Brazelton
Case Number: 3:2013cv01696
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO STAY AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE 7 8 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
December 15, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/15/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TRAVERSE DEADLINE 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
April 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 21 22 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2015: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 4 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saucedo v. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven R. Saucedo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: P. D. Brazelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.