Goldman et al v. Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Goldman and Harriet Scannon
Defendant: Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine, Inc., Paul Koch, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd and Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd
Case Number: 3:2013cv01759
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2016 153 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
August 19, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 129 MOTION in Limine to Determine the Collateral Consequences of the Courts Summary Judgment Order on Defendants Second Counterclaim filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd, 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Pretrial Conference and Trial Date Because of Settlement filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/18/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
April 3, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION 119 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 5, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Stipulation to Participate in Settlement Conferences, filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/5/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 18, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN COUNTERCLAIMS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CERTAIN COUNTERCLAIMS AND SETTING NEW TRIAL DATE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 12, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PARTIES' FEBRUARY 9, 2015 FILING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
February 2, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 85 89 . Parties' joint letter is due 2/9/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/2/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2015 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd. Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/15 is continued to 3/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/29/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
July 11, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/14 is continued to 9/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/11/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
November 5, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/13 is continued to 12/10/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/4/13., Motions terminated: 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
August 29, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 15 15 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
July 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
June 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 Stipulation Extending Time in Which Certain Defendants May Respond to Complaint filed by Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd, Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd, Richard Geoffrey Ward, Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd, Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman et al v. Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Goldman
Represented By: David Alan Makman
Represented By: Robert Craig Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet Scannon
Represented By: David Alan Makman
Represented By: Robert Craig Matz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seawind Group Holdings Pty Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Geoffrey Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Marine Sales Pte Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Marine International Pte Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corsair Marine International Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?