Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc., Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01927
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying-as-moot 108 in Case No. 5:13-cv-01927-LHK-PSG; denying (80) in Case No. 5:13-cv-02416-LHK-PSG; denying (77) in Case No. 5:13-cv-02420-LHK-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER ON CASE NARROWING DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 6/26/14. (lhklc5, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 6/12/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER 97 Granting Joint Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2014. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/11/14. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 6/6/14. (lhklc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER referring case to Magistrate Judge for settlement conference. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 12/11/2013. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting 47 Motion to Relate Case. Cases 13-cv-04001 and 13-cv-04002 are related to this case and other previously related cases. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 33 . Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/15/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 17 Stipulated Extension to Answer Complaint.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Neil Hagglund
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America, Inc.
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Neil Hagglund
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Neil Hagglund
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Ted G. Dane, Esq.
Represented By: Ryan Neil Hagglund
Represented By: Heather E. Takahashi
Represented By: Jeffrey I. Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Handa Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Mark T. Jansen
Represented By: Chiemi Denise Suzuki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Chiemi Denise Suzuki
Represented By: Mark T. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?