Ang et al v. Whitewave Foods Company et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Avoy and Alex Ang
Defendant: Dean Foods Company, Whitewave Foods Company, WWF Operating Company and Horizon Organic Dairy LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01953
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 17 Motion to Dismiss.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/19/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/3/2013. Replies due by 9/18/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 08/09/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ang et al v. Whitewave Foods Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Foods Company
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitewave Foods Company
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWF Operating Company
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Organic Dairy LLC
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Avoy
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Ang
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: David P. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?