United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2366 San Pablo Avenue, Berkeley, California

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2366 San Pablo Avenue, Berkeley, California
Claimant: Berkeley Patients Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02027
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER REGARDING STATUS UPDATES re 175 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING APPEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 163 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 163 MOTION to Stay Action Pending Appeal filed by Berkeley Patients Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 1, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Discovery Order re: 155 Plaintiff United States' Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents Set One to Claimant Berkeley Patients Group. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/17/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 104 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST CLAIMANT CITY OF BERKELEY by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 137 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 137 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by City of Berkeley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING 116 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of the Court's May 22, 2014 Discovery Ruling filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/11/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 135 Motion to Deny Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 136 Motion to Deny Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 127. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/9/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Discovery Order re: 116 Motion for Leave to Appear to Obtain Leave to Reconsider the Court's May 22, 2014 Discovery Ruling 121 Ex Parte Application to Stay the Court's May 22, 2014 Discovery Order 128 Motion for Sanctions Against Plaintiff for Failure to Comply with the Court's Discovery Order Dated May 22, 2014 Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/27/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 112 Order, 130 Order on Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 77 Motion to Strike ; granting 94 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Amended Discovery Order re: Dkt. Nos. 91, 115 (corrected error in caption - no substantive changes). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/6/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING PARTIES' NOTICES AND NOTING PARTIES ABILITY TO FILE MOTIONS TO ENLARGE TIME IF NECESSARY re 118 Notice filed by Berkeley Patients Group, Inc., 119 Notice filed by Nahla Droubi. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR FACTUAL DISCOVERY re 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Request to Enlarge Discovery Deadline for Plaintiff and City of Berkeley filed by City of Berkeley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 2, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Discovery Order re: 91 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRE Motion to Quash Further Subpoena to Board of Equalization filed by Berkeley Patients Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/28/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Discovery Order re: 79 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Claimant BPG's Motion to Compel Answers to Requests for Admissions 78 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Claimant BPG's Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories , 80 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Claimant BPG's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/22/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 110 Joint Stipulation Request Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2 for Order Enlarding Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; [Proposed] Order Pursuant to Local Rule 7-12 filed by City of Berkeley. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to 97 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Terminating at Moot: 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014) Modified on 4/18/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying re 92 Berkeley Patients Group, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Schedule Further Case Management Conference Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 3/20/2014. (tnS) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 77 MOTION to Strike 17 Claim, 21 Claim, 18 Claim, 20 Claim, 19 Claim, 27 Claim (NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE CLAIMS OF GWENDOLYN MCCALOPE, CINDY SMITH, ETIENNE FONTAN, JEFFREY BISHOP, ROBIN BISHOP, AND MARY DAVIS FOR LACK OF STANDING filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 11, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM PRETRIAL NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 76 Notice, filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DISCOVERY ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James re December 13, 2013 Joint Letter 69 . (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER VACATING HEARING on the Government's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, ECF No. 54.. Signed by Judge Tigar on 12/17/13. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Discovery Letter BriefRe Plaintiff's Subpoena to State Board of Equalization filed by Berkeley Patients Group, Inc. Hearing set for 12/9/2013 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Tigar on 12/6/13. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 49 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Certificate of Interested Entities due by 9/5/2013. Show Cause Response due by 9/6/2013. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/29/2013 at 9:30 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property and Improvements Located at 2366 San Pablo Avenue, Berkeley, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property and Improvements Located at 2366 San Pablo Avenue, Berkeley, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Berkeley Patients Group, Inc.
Represented By: Henry George Wykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?