CareFusion 202, Inc. v. Tres Tech Corporation
Plaintiff: CareFusion 202, Inc.
Defendant: Tres Tech Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02194
Filed: May 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 52 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by CareFusion 202, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Third Stipulation and [Proposed] Order To Continue Case Management Conference [Civil L.R. 6-2, 7-12] filed by CareFusion 202, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Tres Tech Corporation Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 27 Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY CASE IN FAVOR OF TEXAS ACTION filed by CareFusion 202, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE OF HEARING OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY CASE IN FAVOR OF TEXAS ACTION. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 25 Respondent's Administrative Motion to Stay Briefing (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 13 Petitioner's Emergency Ex Parte Application for Order Temporarily Staying Respondents From Further Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CareFusion 202, Inc. v. Tres Tech Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CareFusion 202, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Neil Wisnia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tres Tech Corporation
Represented By: Paul Talmage Boston
Represented By: Joseph A. Greco
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Tinker
Represented By: Elisabeth Ann Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?