True Health Chiropractic Inc v. McKesson Corporation
Plaintiff: True Health Chiropractic Inc
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02219
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/27/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER VACATING EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/10/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 520 Stipulation Regarding Filing Redacted 2010 W-2 Forms for Kari Holloway, David Faupel, and Holly Wilson. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.RE BENCH TRIAL AND ORAL ARGUMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 502 MOTION TO STRIKE. Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2022 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 503 Stipulation Re 502 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Strike Untimely and New Evidence and Arguments in Plaintiffs' Reply Brief Regarding Plaintiffs' Individual Claims for Treble Damages re 501 Brief and Objection to Reply Evidence [Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Plaintiffs' Opposition]. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 495 (Unopposed) Administrative Motion for Approval of Dissemination of Decertification Notice Re Docket No. 487 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OFFER OF PROOF; STRIKING 456 UNAUTHORIZED FILING Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/15/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER ENTERING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST THE ONLINE FAX SERVICES CLASS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. on 8/13/2021. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 405 Motion for Entry of Authorization Order Pursuant to the Cable Act. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 414 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cain, Lyndsey. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 408 Stipulation to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 360 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 363 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER REGARDING UPDATED NOTICE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/20/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 362 MOTION TO DECERTIFY CLASS. Joint Statement due by 1/19/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 370 Stipulation TO EXTEND HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANT MTI'S 353 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 355 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 3/5/2020; Replies due by 4/2/2020 and Responses due by 3/19/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 325 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING RENEWED 292 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION Motions due by 8/23/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 323 STIPULATION Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 5/20/2019; Responses due by 6/14/2019; Replies due by 7/1/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT PROCEDURE AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 317 MOTION TO STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 310 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's 292 Renewed Motion for Class Certification. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 301 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 289 Stipulation Regarding Amended Briefing Schedule for Plaintiff's Renewed Class Certification Motion. Discovery due by 11/27/2018; Motions due by 12/4/2018; Responses due by 1/9/2019; Replies due by 1/25/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 287 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Renewed Class Certification Motion : Motions due by 11/29/2018; Responses due by 1/4/2019; Replies due by 1/25/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 280 Unopposed Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Submit Joint Case Management Conference Statement. Case Management Statement due by 9/27/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANTS' 208 MOTION TO STAY. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 209 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING AS MOOT 208 MOTION FOR STAY; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 233 Motion for Permission to Use Courtroom Technology at the September 24, 2015 Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2015)
September 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion for Sanctions.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2015)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 182 Motion for Attorney Fees.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 183 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting 189 STIPULATION re 177 Order on Stipulation. Deadlines/Dates Reset: Discovery due by 7/2/2015; Motions due by 7/16/2015; Responses due by 8/13/2015; Replies due by 8/27/2015; Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/13/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 162 Motion for Sanctions.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE DISCOVERY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 145 Motion to Bifurcate. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 133 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 115 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTERS 79 110 111 .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 119 Motion to Continue.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 84 MOTION to Stay filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue all Scheduling Order Dates Pending Addition of McLaughlin Chiropractice Associates, Inc. and McKesson Technologies, Inc. as New Parties and Resolution of the Parties' July 31, 2014 Discovery Hearing filed by True Health Chiropractic Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 9, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD MCLAUGHLIN AS A CLASS REPRESENTATIVE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 69 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 76 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice. The parties shall meet and confer following the procedures in the standing order. 48 If they are unable to resolve this dispute without judicial intervention, they shall file a joint discovery letter by June 23, 2014.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 46 Discovery Letter Brief without prejudice and ordering the parties to file any joint letter by March 21, 2014.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 37 Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR, Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Mediation (Local Rule 6-2) filed by True Health Chiropractic Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 17 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REINSTATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 17 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by McKesson Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 19, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/28/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Health Chiropractic Inc v. McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Health Chiropractic Inc
Represented By: Willem F. Jonckheer
Represented By: Robert C. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Tyree P. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?