Garibaldi v. Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Sheri Garibaldi
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02223
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2016 Filing 114 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/28/15, before Judge Illston. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #112 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2016. (Related documents(s) #112 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Additional Payment to Claims Administrator. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 4, 2016 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/28/2015 before Hon. Susan Illston by Sheri Garibaldi, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/4/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Additional Payment to Claims Administrator filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 31, 2015 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Motion Hearing held on 8/28/2015. Motion to Approve Settlement is granted.Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/31/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 109 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/28/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015) Modified on 8/28/2015 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #92 Motion for Settlement; granting #97 Motion for Attorney Fees (as amended - see pg. 2). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 107 Request for Judicial Notice In Response to Pittman and Davis Submissions filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - MPA by Cedar Sinai re Pittman Vexatious Litigant Motion, #2 Exhibit EX 2 - PIttman Submission in Wallace, #3 Exhibit EX 3 - Davis Submission in Wallace, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Wallace Judgment, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Ninth Circuit Order Re Pittman Appeal, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Ninth Circuit Order Re Davis Appeal, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Pittman Submission in Lopez, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 - Davis Submission in Lopez, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 - Case Summary in Pittman v. BoA, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 - Chavez Order Re Pittman, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 - Chaves Order Re PIttman in Contempt, #12 Exhibit Ex 12 - Email String re Timing of Submissions)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 106 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND AN ENHANCEMENT AWARD and Proposed Judgment by Sheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment to accompany Order)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 105 RESPONSE/Concerning Pittman and Davis Submissions (re #97 MOTION for Attorney Fees COSTS, and ENHANCEMENT AWARD, #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2015 Filing 104 Declaration in Support of #102 Response ( Non Motion ),, Declaration of Joseph Bush re Randall Pittman filed byBank of America Corporation. (Related document(s) #102 ) (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 103 Declaration in Support of #102 Response ( Non Motion ),, Declaration of Michael D. Mandel in Support of Defendant's Response to Objector and Intervenor Bethines Davis's Objections to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt #100) and Randall Pittman's Notice of Joinder to Besthines Davis's Objections to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt #101) filed byBank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #102 ) (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 102 RESPONSE to re #101 Objection, #100 Objection Defendant's Response to Objector and Intervenor Bethines Davis's Objections to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt #100) and Randall Pittman's Notice of Joinder to Besthines Davis's Objections to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Dkt #101) and Request for Judicial Notice by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Support (re #97 MOTION for Attorney Fees COSTS, and ENHANCEMENT AWARD, #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement ) filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Baker Declaration In Support of Response, #2 Declaration Cudworth Declaration In Support of Response)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 8/21/2015) Modified on 8/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2015 Filing 101 OBJECTIONS to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Randall Pittman. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 100 OBJECTIONS to Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Besthines Maria Davis. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 98 ERRATA re #97 MOTION for Attorney Fees COSTS, and ENHANCEMENT AWARD by Sheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Errata Errata Version of Motion for Fees, Costs, and an Enhancement Award)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 97 MOTION for Attorney Fees COSTS, and ENHANCEMENT AWARD filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 96 Declaration of Chris Baker in Support of #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-5)(Related document(s) #92 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 95 Declaration of Sheri Garibaldi in Support of #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 94 Declaration of Jennifer Jackson in Support of #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 25, 2015 Filing 93 Declaration of Jenny Cudworth in Support of #92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/25/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 92 First MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/14/2015. Replies due by 8/21/2015. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #90 Stipulation to Correct Class Action Settlement. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
May 4, 2015 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #88 Order on Motion for Settlement, to Correct Class Action Settlement, Class Notice and Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
March 20, 2015 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Motion to preliminary approve class settlement is granted.Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2015. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2015) Modified on 3/23/2015 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #80 Motion for Preliminary Certifying the Classes and Subclasses, Order Appointing Counsel, Preliminary Approval Class Settlement. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Oder (extracted out of original document)) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Fairness Hearing set for 8/28/2015 09:00 AM. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2015 at 9:00 a.m. has been continued to 10:00 AM instead. Please report to Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by Bank of America Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/11/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 7, 2015 Filing 85 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Baker Declaration in support of administrative motion to file under seal, #2 Exhibit Unredacted versions of Exhibits 1 - 6 attached to Baker Declaration, #3 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibits 1-6 to Baker Declaration)(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/7/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 84 Declaration of Chris Baker in Support of #80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits To Baker Declaration ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 83 Request for Judicial Notice re #80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 6 through 8 of the Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 82 Declaration of Jennifer Jackson in Support of #80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 81 Declaration of Sheri Garibaldi in Support of #80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 80 First MOTION for Settlement For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Appointment of Class Counsel, Setting of Final Fairness Hearing, and Directing Notice to the Class filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 3/20/2015. Replies due by 3/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Settlement Agreement) and Exhibit 2 (Proposed Order))(Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
March 6, 2015 Filing 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Documents Under Seal In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
February 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER, Motions terminated: #77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER concerning deadline for motion for preliminary approval and hearing date filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/27/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2015)
February 26, 2015 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER concerning deadline for motion for preliminary approval and hearing date filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 20, 2015 Filing 76 NOTICE by Sheri Garibaldi of law firm name change (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER, Motions terminated: #74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To continue hearing date for preliminary approval motion for class settlement filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/10/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To continue filing deadline and hearing date for preliminary approval motion for class settlement filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #72 Stipulation to continue filing deadlines re: Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Filing Deadline and Hearing Date on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
December 18, 2014 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/18/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 Filing 70 CLERK'S NOTICE The case management conference scheduled for 10 a.m. today (Dec. 18, 2014)is being continued to 11 a.m. instead. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 69 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT of the Parties filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Schwartz, Deborah) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 15, 2014 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE: counsel is directed to immediately file an updated case management conference statement for the upcoming conference. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 12/22/14 has been advanced to Thursday, 12/18/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed on 12/15/14. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/17/2014 has been rescheduled to for 12/22/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. If the parties file the joint motion for approval of the settlement by 12/19/2014, the 12/22/2014 further case management conference will be vacated. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 65 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 10/3/14 is continued to 10/17/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER, Motions terminated: #62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #60 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,, to vacate class certification hearing date filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/8/14(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #60 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Hearings,, to vacate class certification hearing date and all related deadlines filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/6/2014) Modified on 5/7/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2014 Filing 61 Answer to #49 Fourth Amended Complaint by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 4/15/2014) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 Filing 60 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/4/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/7/2014). Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/7/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 1, 2014 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE : Counsel is directed to file a joint case management conference statement immediately for the 4/4/14 conference. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS #52 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 56 Objection to #54 Request for Judicial Notice in Reply filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/25/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Filing 55 REPLY (re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, Or In The Alternative, To Strike Class Action Allegations ) filed byBank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Screen Shot of Plaintiff's profile from payroll system reflecting Plaintiff's Scheduled Hours)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 54 Request for Judicial Notice re #53 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 14, 2014 Filing 53 RESPONSE (re #52 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, Or In The Alternative, To Strike Class Action Allegations ) filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint, Or In The Alternative, To Strike Class Action Allegations filed by Bank of America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 3/14/2014. Replies due by 3/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Excerpts of 2010 Employee Handbook, #2 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 26, 2014 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/26/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 2/26/2014). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Markman hearing set for 4/4/2014 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2014)
February 24, 2014 Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 49 Fourth AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation. Filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 2/13/2014) Modified on 2/13/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #47 Motion to Vacate (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 30, 2014 vacated 6/14/14 reserved motion hearing (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 47 First MOTION to Vacate #26 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Hearings,, Stipulation and Proposed Order to Vacate Class Certification Hearing Date and Related Deadlines filed by Sheri Garibaldi. Responses due by 2/12/2014. Replies due by 2/19/2014. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/14 is continued to 2/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/14 is continued to 2/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The joint case management conference statement shall be filed one week prior to the conference. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS #35 . GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART defendants motion to dismiss. The Court further DENIES defendants motion to strike the class allegations. Any amended complaint must be filed not later than February 14, 2014. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2013 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) with respect to Request For Judicial Notice Set Forth In Defendant's Reply filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 42 REPLY (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) filed byBank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Mandel, #2 Exhibit A)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 9, 2013 Filing 41 RESPONSE (re #35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #39 Stipulation : ORDER to modify briefing schedule (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Replies due by 12/16/2013. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to modify briefing schedule filed by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 4, 2013 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the case management conference has been continued from January 31, 2014, to Wednesday, February 5, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. The Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed on or before January 29, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #36 Stipulation To Continue Hearing Date And Modify Briefing Schedule On Defendants Motion To Dismiss (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 26, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Hearing Date And Modify Briefing Schedule On Defendants Motion To Dismiss filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss And/Or Strike Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/26/2013. Replies due by 12/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- List of national banks as of 10/31/2013, #2 Exhibit B -- Exemplar pay stubs from DLSE, #3 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #32 Stipulation GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Bank of America Corporation. Filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE by Sheri Garibaldi Notice Of Partial Settlement (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #29 for extenstion to respond to 2nd amended complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Granting Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #27 Stipulation for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #25 Amended Document for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/27/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 9/30/2013). Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2014 03:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 25 AMENDED DOCUMENT/Second Amended Complaint by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 9/24/2013) Modified on 9/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 4TH EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. re #23 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/18/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 22 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint to September 17, 2013 filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 20 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/13 is continued 9/27/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Extending Time for Defendants To Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/19/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION for Extension of Deadline for Defendant to Respond to First Amended Complaint to September 4, 2013 filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
June 19, 2013 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #14 Stipulation FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation. Filed bySheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 13 JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/28/13. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time To Respond To Complaint to June 5, 2013 filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sheri Garibaldi.. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sheri Garibaldi. (Baker, Christopher) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint To May 24, 2013 filed by Bank of America Corporation. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE by Bank of America Corporation of Pendency of Other Actions [Local Rule 3-13] (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons; by Bank of America Corporation identifying Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of America, N.A. for Bank of America Corporation. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 3 Declaration of ROBERT DROZYNSKI in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byBank of America Corporation. (Related document(s) #1 ) (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/15/13. (Attachments: #1 LB Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION (NO PROCESS); from The Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo. Their case number is CIV 521097. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number 346110868094). Filed byBank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2015: #2 receipt) (ysS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garibaldi v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Garibaldi
Represented By: Christopher David Baker
Represented By: Deborah R. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Killens
Represented By: John A Van Hook
Represented By: John Arthur Van Hook
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?