Padilla v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Padilla
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc, One West Bank, FSB, North American Title Insurance Company, Cwalt, Inc., Park Monaco Inc, Park Granada LLC, Park Sienna LLC and The Bank of New York
Case Number: 3:2013cv02241
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING MARCH 21, 2014 HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 17, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF FALSE CLAIMS ACT CAUSES OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 7, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON STIPULATION CONCERNING THE PLEADINGS, INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBTAIN COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 1, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One West Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cwalt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Monaco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Granada LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Sienna LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?