Moore v. Urban Outfitters Wholesale, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Moore
Defendant: Urban Outfitters Wholesale, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02245
Filed: May 16, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER GRANTING 121 REQUEST TO VACATE CASE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING 118 Stipulation Permitting Plaintiff To File First Amended Complaint and Taking Off Calendar Plaintiff's Pending Motion For Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/5/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING 109 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON MOTIONS RELATING TO CLASS CERTIFICATION. Replies due by 10/28/2015. Responses due by 9/30/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/22/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 100 Notice of Withdrawal of 74 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing and Hearing any Motions Relating to Class Certification. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/23/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER WITHDRAWING REMAND ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motions to Remand. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 16, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER STRIKING (11 in 3:13-cv-03184-JSW) Motion to Remand, Lifting Stay, and Setting Case Management Conference in All Related Cases. Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 22, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014) Modified on 1/22/2014 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MDL 2483 ORDER Denying Transfer of Cases. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER.Hearing on Motion to Remand set for 11/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 22 STIPULATION to CONTINUE AUGUST 23, 2013 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/19/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Urban Outfitters Wholesale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Moore
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Lowery
Represented By: Shooka Moallem
Represented By: Raul Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Outfitters Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl Denise Orr
Represented By: Jaime Danielle Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?