Sharma et al v. BMW of North America LLC

Plaintiff: Monita Sharma and Eric Anderson
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02274
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 23, 2017 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING JUNE 30, 2017 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAY PENDING SETTLEMENT. The stay is continued, pending the settlement approval process before Judge Forrest. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 30, 2017, to September 29, 2017. The parties shall jointly submit a Case Management Statement no later than September 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 23, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
October 19, 2016 181 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. The briefing schedule is modified as follows. No later than December 2, 2016, plaintiff shall file his motion for class certification. No later than January 27, 2017, plaintiff shall produce his expert(s) for deposition. No later than March 6, 2017, defendant BMW of North America, Inc. shall file its opposition to the motion for class certification. No later than March 31, 2017, defendant shall produce its expert(s) for deposition. No later than April 24, 2017, plaintiff shall file his reply. The hearing on the motion is scheduled for May 26, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/19/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. To the extent BMW seeks summary judgment on the claims asserted on behalf of plaintiff Sharma, the motion is granted. To the BMW se eks summary judgment on the claims asserted on behalf of plaintiff Anderson, the motion is granted as to all claims other than those based on the RDC module, and to the extent the claims asserted on behalf of Anderson are based on the RDC module, the motion is denied. The parties are directed to file, no later than fourteen days from the date of this order, either (a) a stipulation setting forth a proposed briefing schedule and hearing date on plaintiffs' motion for class certification, or (b) if the parties are unable to so stipulate, a joint statement setting forth their respective proposed schedules. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
June 17, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 17, 2016.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
May 26, 2016 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss and for summary judgment is continued from June 3, 2016, to June 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 26, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
April 29, 2016 149 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 146 Motion for Reconsideration.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 1, 2016 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING. No later than April 15, 2016, defendant shall file a supplement al memorandum, not to exceed five pages in length, excluding exhibits, setting forth its argument as to the Third Claim for Relief. No later than May 6, 2016, plaintiffs shall file their opposition to defendant's motion. No later than May 20, 2016, defendant shall file its reply.The hearing on defendant's motion is set for June 3, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 15, 2016 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 130 Discovery Letter Brief re: BMW NA Retention Policies filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson, 135 Discovery Letter Brief re: Limited Scope of Discovery Responses filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson, 134 Discovery Letter Brief re: Design and Manufacturing Documents and Responses filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 03/15/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; VACATING ORDER DISMISSING THIRD CLAIM FOR RELIEF; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER. Defendant is directed to file, no later than March 28, 2016, an amended answer to the TAC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 7, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Leave to Exceed Page Limit for Attachments Related to Discovery Letter Briefs filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
January 12, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 111 Discovery Letter Brief re: Limited Scope of Discovery Responses filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson, 110 Discovery Letter Brief re: BMW NA Retention Policies filed by Monita Sharma, Eric Anderson, 113 Discovery Letter Briefre Design and Manufacturing Documents and Responses filed by BMW of North America LLC.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/12/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
November 24, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO SEAL; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 24, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
January 6, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 6, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
October 21, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
June 19, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. The Second Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. If plaintiff s wish to file a Third Amended Complaint for purposes of curing any or all of the deficiencies identified with respect to the Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, and/or Seventh Claims for Relief, any such Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than July 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
April 29, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
March 4, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE CLASS ACTION ALLEGATIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 4, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 12, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' claim for injunctive relief is dismissed. Plaintiffs are affo rded leave to file, no later than February 28, 2014, a Second Amended Complaint to allege any additional facts to establish their standing to seek injunctive relief and/or to add additional parties who can establish their standing to seek injunctive relief. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 7, 2014 to April 25, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 18, 2014.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
January 15, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIM FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF STANDING, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs are directed to show cause, in writing and no late r than February 7, 2014, why their claim for injunctive relief should not be dismissed for lack of standing; additionally, plaintiffs may file, no later than February 7, 2014 and limited to three pages in length, a response to the Statement of Recent Decision filed by BMW on November 25, 2013. Alternatively, plaintiffs may respond to the instant order by filing, no later than February 7, 2014, a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
November 12, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
September 26, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AGREED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS; EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. The Court extends the deadline for plaintiffs to file their opposition briefs from September 27, 2013 to October 1, 2013, and extends the deadline for defendant to file their replies from October 11, 2013 to October 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2013.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
August 7, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION ON DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Defendant's deadline to respond to the FAC is August 29, 2013. Plaintiffs' opposition to any motion is due September 27, 2013, and defendant's reply is due by October 11, 2013. The initial case management conference is continued from August 23, 2013 to January 10, 2014. Defendant's motion to dismiss the initial complaint and the motion to strike are denied as moot in light of the filing of the FAC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
June 12, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EDWARD A. WALLACE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/4/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharma et al v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monita Sharma
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: William Alter Kershaw
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Anderson
Represented By: Ian James Barlow
Represented By: Amy Elisabeth Keller
Represented By: William Alter Kershaw
Represented By: Stuart C. Talley
Represented By: Edward A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Represented By: Aengus Hartley Carr
Represented By: Troy Masami Yoshino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?