Raimondo et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff: Dennis Joseph Raimondo and Eric Anthony Garris
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2013cv02295
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 114 Defendant's Second Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 117 Plaintiffs' Second Cross-motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Reconsideration. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER RE: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/29/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE: CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 63 Motion for Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Amended ORDER granting 60 Proposed Schedule filed by Eric Anthony Garris, Dennis Joseph Raimondo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/17/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 43 Motion to Compel (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/7/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raimondo et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joseph Raimondo
Represented By: Marley Freeman Degner
Represented By: Laura Christine Hurtado
Represented By: Thomas V. Loran III
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Anthony Garris
Represented By: Marley Freeman Degner
Represented By: Laura Christine Hurtado
Represented By: Thomas V. Loran III
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Jennifer S Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?