Eckersley v. Southwest Airlines Co.

Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Plaintiff: Sarah Eckersley
Case Number: 3:2013cv02519
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Conditional Dismissal by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, ***Civil Case Terminated.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 23, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Pretrial Dates by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
July 3, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Status Conference is set for 7/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A joint status conference statement shall be filed no later than July 15, 2014.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
September 13, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 9/4/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckersley v. Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Airlines Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Eckersley
Represented By: Jane Louise Trigero
Represented By: Steven R. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?