Thomas v. Bostwick

Plaintiff: Richard Todd Thomas
Defendant: James S. Bostwick
Case Number: 3:2013cv02544
Filed: June 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order 146 ORDER GRANTING re 144 Ex Parte Motion to Cancel Judgment Debtor's Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam of Defendant James Bostwick, set for 8/21/15 at 9:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero is VACATED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/20/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order 144 ORDER Judgment Debtor Exam as to James Bostwick set for 8/21/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C.Spero on 7/22/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order 140 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 104 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order 131 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero resolving 130 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendant shall produce documents or withdraw argument by 3/26/2015. Plaintiff's reply brief due 4/3/2015.(jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order 103 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 92 Motion to Alter Judgment.(jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order 95 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying without prejudice 88 Motion for Attorney Fees. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order 85 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order 83 AMENDED ORDER granting 63 MOTION to Quash Notice of Lien filed by Richard Todd Thomas, and replacing 82 ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/29/2014.(jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order 78 ORDER GRANTING re 76 REQUEST TO FILE Supplemental Brief filed by James S. Bostwick. Plaintiff may file a response by close of business on Friday, 8/29/14. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/25/14. NOTE: It is counsel's responsibility to e-file the supplemental brief, attached as Exhibit A to this request.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER GRANTING re 31 Letter filed by James S. Bostwick for Suzanne Babb to appear by phone on 1/17/14 at 1:30 PM. Ms. Babb will provide a conference call number to counsel & the Court. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/15/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 12/13/13 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 1/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 8 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER GRANTING re 6 Stipulation To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by James S. Bostwick. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Bostwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Todd Thomas
Represented By: Steven M. Olson
Represented By: Steven Marc Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S. Bostwick
Represented By: Suzanne K. Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?