Greene v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Rosemary Greene
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and ETS Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02774
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/9/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 9 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE [re 21 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Rosemary Greene]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerks Notice, Terminate Hearings. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/26/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Elizabeth Christine Hehir
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ETS Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Greene
Represented By: Chris T Nguyen
Represented By: Joel Mark Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?