Public.Resource.org v. United States Internal Revenue Service Featured Case
Plaintiff: Public.Resource.org
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2013cv02789
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge William H. Orrick granting 91 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 95 Motion for Leave to File. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
September 11, 2015 Filing 96 CLERK'S NOTICE - The hearing as to 91 Motion for Attorney's Fees set for 9/16/2015 is VACATED. Per Civil L.R. 7-1(b), the Court has determined that this motion is appropriate for determination without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen S. Ho, # 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Sur-Reply, # 3 Proposed Order)(Ho, Stephen) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 94 REPLY (re 91 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) IN SUPPORT OF PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG.'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS; SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF THOMAS R. BURKE WITH EXHIBIT C filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit C)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Palacios As Co-Counsel for Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org (Palacios, Diana) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 12, 2015 Filing 92 RESPONSE (re 91 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) Defendant's Opposition filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Ho, Stephen) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Public.Resource.org. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/12/2015. Replies due by 8/19/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Stephen Shuching Ho (Ho, Stephen) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 89 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel RE 88 USCA Order(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER of USCA : Appellant's motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal is granted. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. FOR THE COURT; as to 73 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Internal Revenue Service (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the 86 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, the motion hearing previously scheduled for 6/10/2015 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
June 8, 2015 Filing 86 Notice of Withdrawal of 80 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 6/8/2015) Modified on 6/9/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2015 Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Motion Hearing as to 80 MOTION to Stay set for 6/10/2015 02:00 PM will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 84 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Public.Resource's deadline to file a motion to recover attorneys' fees and costs is extended until August 4, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by Public.Resource.org. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Public.Resource.org for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 12, 2015 Filing 81 RESPONSE (re 80 MOTION to Stay re 62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, 72 Order on Stipulation ) PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 5, 2015 Filing 80 MOTION to Stay re 62 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, 72 Order on Stipulation filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/19/2015. Replies due by 5/26/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 79 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 78 Stipulation Extending Plaintiff's Deadline to Move to Recover Attorneys' Fees and Costs. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to Move for Attorney's Fees filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 77 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 6/18/14 and 1/14/15 before Judge William H. Orrick, (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 76 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 06/18/14, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:58 - 2:18. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 70 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 4/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2015. (Related documents(s) 70 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 75 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recroding held on 01/14/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:05 - 2:21. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 70 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 4/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2015. (Related documents(s) 70 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 74 USCA Case Number 15-15607 for 73 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Appeal of Judgment 63 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, 62 , Order on Motion to Dismiss 42 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 3/30/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2015: # 1 USCA Number: 15-15607) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 71 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time to Produce Documents and Extending Plaintiff's Time to Move for Attorney's Fees filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 70 ** CORRECTION: This is an order for hearings held on 6/18/14 (not 6/18/0201) and 1/14/15. ** TRANSCRIPT ORDER by United States Internal Revenue Service for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/25/2015 (djc, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2015 Filing 69 Letter from Thomas R. Burke to Hon. William H. Orrick requesting publication in official reporter of Dkt 62 (Order granting plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment). (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 67 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
March 9, 2015 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 66 Order, Second Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiff's Time to Move to Recover Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS re 64 STIPULATION. Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to recover attorneys fees and costs shall be extended until March 16, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/10/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 65 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - INCORRECT DOCUMENT IMAGE ATTACHED***STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 64 Stipulation. Plaintiff's deadline to file a motion to recover attorneys fees and costs shall be extended until March 16, 2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO MOVE TO RECOVER ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 63 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/29/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. the IRSs motion for summary judgment is DENIED and Public.Resource.orgs motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The government shall produce the requested nine form 990s in the MeF format within sixty days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 21, 2015 Filing 61 ERRATA re 56 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Corrected Declaration of Dwayne Ross by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 14, 2015 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2015 re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Internal Revenue Service and 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Public.Resource. Corrected declaration of Dwayne Ross to be filed by defense within one week. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Court Reporter: FTR 2:05-2:21. Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney Yonatan Gelblum. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2015)
December 5, 2014 Filing 59 REPLY (re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF PUBLIC.RESOURCE.ORG'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON PARTIES' CROSS-MOITONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Hearing re 46 , 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment continued to 1/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Stipulation and Proposed Order Rescheduling Hearing to January 14, 2015 filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 56 RESPONSE (re 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) (Opposition and Reply) filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Second Declaration of D. Ross, # 3 Affidavit Second Declaration of L. Rosenmerkel)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 1, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment per 44 Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 12/5/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 55 Declaration of Tim Bray in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 54 Declaration of Clay Johnson in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 53 Declaration of Peter Skomoroch in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 52 Declaration of Kendall Taggart in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 51 Declaration of Ken Berger in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 50 Declaration of Scott Klein in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 49 Declaration of Beth Simone Noveck in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 48 Declaration of Carl Malamud in Support of 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Consolidated Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Public.Resource.org. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/29/2014. Replies due by 12/05/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 to revise response and reply dates (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/29/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of A. Leach, # 3 Declaration of D. Higley, # 4 Declaration of D. Ross, # 5 Declaration of J. Archibald, # 6 Declaration of L. Rosenmerkel, # 7 Declaration of M. Hooke, # 8 Declaration of U. Gillis, # 9 Exhibit 101, # 10 Exhibit 102, # 11 Exhibit 103, # 12 Exhibit 104, # 13 Exhibit 105, # 14 Exhibit 106, # 15 Exhibit 107)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 1, 2014 Filing 45 ANSWER to 1 Complaint byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 8/1/2014) Modified on 8/4/2014 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE by United States Internal Revenue Service re 43 Notice (Other) Joint Revised Proposed Briefing Schedule (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE by Public.Resource.org re 41 Motion Hearing, PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 41 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2014 before William H. Orrick re 14 MOTION to Dismiss. The parties are directed to meet and confer regarding the briefing schedule for the motions and to submit a proposed schedule within ten (10) days. (Court Reporter FTR 1:58-2:18) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Laidman as Co-Counsel for Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org (Laidman, Daniel) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Public.Resource.org (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 19, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss set for 6/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 37 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 5/8/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Further telephonic mediation session held 4/1/2014; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 16, 2014 POSTED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable James Donato, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/jd-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/16/2014. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) Modified on 4/16/2014 (wv, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting (with modifications) 35 Stipulation. Unless the parties notify the Court that a settlement has been reached, hearing on the Motion to Dismiss and the Initial Case Management Conference shall occur on June 18, 2014. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than June 11, 2014, setting forth, among other matters, a proposed case management schedule. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 34 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 3/5/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Further telephonic mediation session held 3/5/2014; Further telephonic mediation session scheduled for 4/1/2014 at 11:30 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 10, 2014 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 2/10/2014 by Mediator, Stephen Liacouras; Mediation session held 1/24/2014; Further telephonic mediation session held 2/10/2014; Further telephonic mediation session scheduled for 3/5/2014 at 11:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2014 at 11:00 AM. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 18, 2013 Filing 32 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Stephen Liacouras as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 12, 2013 CASE REFERRED to ADR Program for Mediation 31 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 9, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing previously set for 12/18/2013 VACATED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 31 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting as modified 30 Stipulation. The parties shall re-calendar the Motion To Dismiss and Case Management Conference for hearing no later than March 19, 2014 on a Wednesday law and motion calendar if the mediation does not result in settlement, or shall notify the Court immediately if settlement is reached.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 20, 2013 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/15/2013 and 11/19/2013 by Howard Herman, ADR Program Director. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 15, 2013 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 11/15/2013 with Howard Herman, ADR Program Director. Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/19/2013 at 10:30 a.m. Call-in information remains the same.(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference is reset for 12/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (to follow hearing on motion to dismiss). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 27 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/15/2013 at 10:00 a.m. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 25 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 24 Renotice motion hearing re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 17 Opposition/Response to Motion, 14 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/30/2013. Replies due by 10/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 20 , 14 ) (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 23 REPLY (re 14 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byUnited States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 16, 2013 Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (per 16 Stipulation and Order) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. The hearing date for the motion to dismiss is off calendar. Defendant shall renotice the hearing for a date not less than two weeks after a reply brief is filed. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/15/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Public.Resource.org. United States Internal Revenue Service served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 17 Opposition/Response to Motion, 14 MOTION to Dismiss STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RESCHEDULING REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Gelblum, Yonatan) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ronald G. London. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 18 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ronald G. London ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8046056.) filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/1/2013) Modified on 10/2/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2013 Filing 17 RESPONSE (re 14 MOTION to Dismiss ) Plaintiff Public.Resource.Org's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING AND BRIEFING RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS - Motion Hearing re 14 Motion to Dismiss set for 10/23/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Response in opposition due by 9/30/2013. Reply due by 10/7/2013. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2013. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled September 17, 2013, is rescheduled for November 19, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013) Modified on 10/16/2013 to include rescheduled CMC date (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 14 MOTION to Dismiss , 10 Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Initial Case Management Conference and Hearing and Briefing Re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Public.Resource.org. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/17/2013. Replies due by 9/24/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER re 12 Stipulation. The United States shall have until and including September 3, 2013, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/24/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Sanders, Christopher) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 12, 2013 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Public.Resource.org re 10 Order (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/11/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 3, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Public.Resource.org.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
June 28, 2013 Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7800387.) filed by Public.Resource.org. (Halperin, David) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Internal Revenue Service. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/18/13. (Attachments: # 1 NC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE AND FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACTS; against United States Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 34611087898.). Filed byPublic.Resource.org. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Public.Resource.org v. United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public.Resource.org
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Represented By: David E Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?