Labyrinth Optical Technologies LLC v. Oclaro Inc

Plaintiff: Labyrinth Optical Technologies LLC
Defendant: Oclaro Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02837
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
September 10, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Statement and Case Management Conference filed by Oclaro Inc., Labyrinth Optical Technologies LLC Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 11/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
October 30, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/30/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labyrinth Optical Technologies LLC v. Oclaro Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labyrinth Optical Technologies LLC
Represented By: Paul A Lesko
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oclaro Inc.
Represented By: Brian Lam
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Represented By: Robyn Gould
Represented By: Wayne O. Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.