Bui v. Parks

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Christine N. Bui
Case Number: 3:2013cv02879
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FILING BY PLAINTIFF. Motions due by 5/30/2014.. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
June 3, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on June 3, 2014. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
October 2, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE AND INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bui v. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine N. Bui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.