Sandoz Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Defendant: Hoffman-La Roche Inc and Amgen Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02904
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Amgen Inc., Hoffman-La Roche Inc against Sandoz Inc. Defendants motion to dismiss is hereby GRANTED, and the complaint is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice and without leave to amend. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 12, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. The Court will afford plaintiff leave to file, no later than November 5, 2013, a supplemental declaration for the purpose of specifying the particular sealable portions of paragraphs 2(A)-2(BB) of the Declaration of Vernon M. Winters and Exhibit 1 thereto. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO AMEND DATE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss is re-scheduled from November 1, 2013 to November 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADJUST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINES; VACATING OCTOBER 11, 2013 HEARING. The Case Management Conference is continued to January 10, 2014, at 10:30 a.m., and all related deadlines are extended in accordance therewith. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MELINDA K. LACKEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 29, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE UNDER SEAL UNREDACTED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 15, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoz Inc. v. Amgen Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman-La Roche Inc
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Samuel N. Tiu
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Samuel N. Tiu
Represented By: Sue Wang
Represented By: Vernon Michael Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Joon Oh
Represented By: Ian James Nomura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?