Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice Featured Case
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2013cv02946
Filed: June 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2013 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/26/2013 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 9/26/2013). Status Report due by 1/31/2014. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/26/2013)
September 24, 2013 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman Director, ADR Program on September 23, 2013. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Dpeartment of Justice. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/20/2013 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re 20 Order on Stipulation. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 01:45 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 18 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings requesting to appear telephonically at case managment conference filed by Department of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 11, 2013 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 9/23/13 at 2:00 p.m. Dial-in information remains the same. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 17 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 9/20/13 at 2:00 p.m. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 12 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Sobel.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7879664.) filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Sobel, David) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Justice. (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia K. Sowles for Defendant (Sowles, Marcia) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 19, 2013 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due by August 2, 2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 8, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Department of Justice served on 6/26/2013, answer due 7/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2013 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 26, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611087303.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2013: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (farS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2013: # 2 Complaint) (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lynch
Represented By: David L. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Marcia K. Sowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?