Selleck v. Rode et al

Plaintiff: Linda Buckbee Selleck
Defendant: Keith Rode and CliftonLarsonAllen, LLP
Case Number: 3:2013cv03055
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT: The parties, having filed a Notice of Settlement on June 6, 2016 (See Docket Item No. 76 ), are ordered to appear before the Honorable Edward J. Davila on Thursday, July 21, 2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom No. 4, 5th Floor, San Jose to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before July 14, 2016, the parties shall file a joint statement in response to the Order to Show Cause setting forth the status of settlement efforts as well as the amount of additional time necessary to finalize and file a dismissal. The Order to Show Cause shall be automatically vacated and the parties relieved of the obligation to file a joint statement if a stip ulated dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) is filed on or before July 8, 2016. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
February 26, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Having reviewed the parties' Joint Case Management Conference Statement (Dkt. No. 64 ), the court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Co nference scheduled for March 3, 2016, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on May 5, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before April 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 22, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed on or before 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/22/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 1, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/1/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
December 14, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court has determined that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for December 17, 2015, is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on February 4, 2016. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before January 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/14/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 9, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the court finds that a scheduling conference is premature at this time. Accordingly, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/12/2015, is CONTINUED to 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement, or separate statements if appropriate under Civil Local Rule 16-9, on or before 12/10/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/9/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
June 25, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Because the related criminal action is approaching final resolution, the court now finds the circumstances no longer justify the abatement of this case in favor of that action. Tthe stay first imposed on November 20, 2013 is DISSOLVED. Case reopened. Defendant CliftonLarsonAllen, LLP's ("Clifton") must re-file its motion to dismiss to place it before the court, and all briefing related to that motion should thereafter re-occur accor ding to Civil Local Rule 7. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/25/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
February 14, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the recently-extended stay of this action, the Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/28/2014 is VACATED and will be reset by the court when appropriate. The clerk shall administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/14/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 11, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending stay signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on February 11, 2014. (ejdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
September 23, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CliftonLarsonAllen, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selleck v. Rode et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Buckbee Selleck
Represented By: Craig Sheridan Miller
Represented By: William S. Weisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Rode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CliftonLarsonAllen, LLP
Represented By: Issa Kalani Moe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?