Xu et al v. Yamanaka

Plaintiff: Rongxiang Xu and Mebo International, Inc.
Defendant: Shinya Yamanaka
Case Number: 3:2013cv03240
Filed: July 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF ESCROW re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Joint Notice of Settlement and Request for Release of Escrow filed by Shinya Yamanaka, Mebo International, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/8/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WRIT of Execution (Los Angeles) issued in the amount of $86,703.00 as to Rongxiang Xu and Mebo International (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 31 Administrative Motion to Seal Documents Relating to Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/1/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. The hearing set for 4/8/2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/30/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 11 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively Special Anti-SLAPP Motion to Strike the First Amended Complaint, Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Motions terminated: 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER, 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/2/13. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xu et al v. Yamanaka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rongxiang Xu
Represented By: William Lee Buus
Represented By: Alexander J. Chang
Represented By: Stephen Dennis Johnson
Represented By: Hubert H Kuo
Represented By: Eric Martin Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mebo International, Inc.
Represented By: William Lee Buus
Represented By: Alexander J. Chang
Represented By: Stephen Dennis Johnson
Represented By: Hubert H Kuo
Represented By: Eric Martin Schiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinya Yamanaka
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Gregory D. Hull
Represented By: Bambo Obaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?