Zynga Inc. v. Bang With Friends, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Zynga Inc.
Defendant: Bang With Friends, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03517
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2013 Filing 18 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 2, 2013 Filing 17 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 18 *** REPORT on the determination of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: # 1 Order of Dismissal)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013) Modified on 10/2/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE AND RETAINING JURISDICTION re 15 Stipulation filed by Bang With Friends, Inc., Zynga Inc.,. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/1/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION Requesting Entry Of Proposed Order Dismissing Case With Prejudice And Retaining Jurisdiction, filed by Zynga Inc., Bang With Friends, Inc.. (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 9/30/2013) Modified on 10/1/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, (Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Five (5) Days) filed by Zynga Inc., Bang With Friends, Inc. (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 9/20/2013) Modified on 9/23/2013 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2013 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Seven (7) Days re 1 Complaint, filed by Zynga Inc., Bang With Friends, Inc.. (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 9/12/2013) Modified on 9/13/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Seven (7) Days re 1 Complaint, filed by Zynga Inc., Bang With Friends, Inc.. (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 9/5/2013) Modified on 9/6/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2013 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 1 Complaint,, and various notices and orders re: civil cases (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zynga Inc. re 3 Summons Issued, 4 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Complaint (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2013 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline to Respond by Sixteen (16) Days re 1 Complaint, filed by Zynga Inc., Bang With Friends, Inc.. (McFarland, Larry) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/2/13. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Zynga Inc... (Varas, Christopher) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013) Modified on 8/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zynga Inc. identifying Other Affiliate L. John Doerr, Other Affiliate William Joy, Other Affiliate Raymond Lane, Other Affiliate Brook Byers, Other Affiliate KPCB Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mark Pincus, Other Affiliate Alison Pincus, Other Affiliate Ogden Enterprises LLC, Other Affiliate KPCB XIII, LLC, Other Affiliate KPCB Digital Growth Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate KPCB Digital Growth Founders Fund, LLC, Other Affiliate KPCB XIII, Other Affiliate KPCB XIII Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate KPCB DGF Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Joseph Lacob, Other Affiliate Theodore Schlein, Other Affiliate William "Bing" Gordon for Zynga Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bang With Friends, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2013 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 30, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bang With Friends, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611088379). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byZynga Inc. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2013: # 1 Complaint Pt.02) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2013: # 2 Complaint Pt.03) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2013: # 3 Complaint Pt.04) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2013: # 4 Complaint Pt.05) (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2013: # 5 Complaint Pt.06, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Inc. v. Bang With Friends, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Inc.
Represented By: Larry Wayne McFarland
Represented By: Christopher Theodore Varas
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bang With Friends, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?