July 29, 2016 |
Filing
210
ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
188
ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing and/or Evidence. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
184
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 183 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 182 Stipulation and Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, resetting deadline for CMC statement to 2/18/2016;Status conference to be adjourned to 2/25/2016; and motion for prel iminary approval now due 1/15/2016 filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Baltimore County Employees' Retirement System Status Report due by 2/25/2016. Status Conference set for 3/3/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/7/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
182
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Status Report due by 1/21/2016. Status Conference reset for 1/28/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing
178
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Case Schedule, Motions terminated: 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Baltimore County Employees' Retirement System.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
162
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 161 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING filed by William R. Zerella, Vocera Communications Inc, Robert J. Zollars, Brent D. Lang Status Report due by 10/29/2015. Class Certification Motion Hearing reset for 11/5/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Conference reset for 11/5/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing
118
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 111 MOTION to Dismiss Vocera Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 99 Order on Stipulation Ext filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Baltimore County Employees' Retirement System, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 111 MOTION to Dismiss Vocera D efendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 99 Order on Stipulation Ext. Responses due by 11/26/2014. Replies due by 12/17/2014.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
|
August 15, 2014 |
Filing
99
Order as Modified by Hon. Edward M. Chen granting 98 Stipulation Setting Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint and Responsive Motion(s) and Continuing Case Managememt Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
93
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 73 Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Limit the Scope of Confidentiality Agreements Signed by Former Vocera Employees. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
|
July 22, 2014 |
Filing
90
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 68 Stipulation and Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 71 Clerks Notice, Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by John B. Grotti ng, Martin J. Silver, Brian D. Ascher, William R. Zerella, Vocera Communications Inc, Robert J. Zollars, Jeffrey H. Hillebrand, Howard E. Janzen, Donald F. Wood, Hany M. Nada, John N. McMullen, Brent D. Lang Case Management Statement due by 9/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing
85
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Reply Brief filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Baltimore County Employees' Retirement System. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
|
April 1, 2014 |
Filing
68
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING OF MOTION filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Baltimore County Employees' Retirement System Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/1/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing
65
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 60 Amended Document, 38 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by John B. Grotting, Martin J. Silver, Brian D. Ascher, William R. Zerella, Vocera Communications Inc, Robert J. Zollars, Jeffrey H. Hillebrand, Howard E. Janzen, Donald F. Wood, Hany M. Nada, John N. McMullen, Brent D. Lang. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
|
November 20, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER 39 41 for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing
38
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 36 by John B. Grotting, Martin J. Silver, Brian D. Ascher, William R. Zerella, Vocera Communications Inc, Robert J. Zollars, Jeffrey H. Hillebrand, Howard E. Janzen, Donald F. Wood, Hany M. Nada, John N. McMullen, Brent D. Lang Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing
34
STIPULATION AND ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
|