Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al v. City of Richmond, California et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Defendant: City of Richmond, California and Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC
Amicus: Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc., California Bankers Association, American Bankers Association, California Mortgage Bankers Association, California Credit Union League, Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association and Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv03663
Filed: August 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2013 Filing 89 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 09/12/13 before Judge Breyer, (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 88 Costs Taxed in the amount of $0.0. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 22, 2013 Filing 87 USCA Case Number 13-17080 for 82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 21, 2013 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 85 Order on Motion for Leave to File (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 80 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 84 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2013 Filing 83 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 82 Notice of Appeal. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Appeal of Judgment 79 , Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 78 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Fee Paid - Pay.gov Tracking ID: 25CPFVOS) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 81 BILL OF COSTS by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae, and to File Memorandum, as Amicus Curiae by William K. McKim. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 79 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on September 16, 2013. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey M. Leyton (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 76 Supplemental Brief re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 75 Supplemental Brief re 46 Opposition/Response to Motion, 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction 46 Motion to Dismiss, 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s) 46 , 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 13, 2013 Filing 74 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Wilmington Trust Company for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Osenbaugh, Kurt) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 73 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 12, 2013, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2013. (Related documents(s) 70 , 72 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J P Relman) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 12, 2013 Filing 69 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/12/2013) MOTIONS for Leave to File 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City of Richmond, California, et al. 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Supplemental briefs due by 5:00 p.m. on 9/13/2013. (Court Reporter Belle Ball) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 68 Supplemental Brief re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Related document(s) 38 , 8 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Rosen (Rosen, Marcia) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 66 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25CAI69L.) Filing fee previously paid on 9/10/2013 filed by Bay Area Legal Aid, California Reinvestment Coalition, Housing and Economic Rights Advocates, Law Foundation of Silicon Valley, National Housing Law Project. (Relman, John) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 10, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Lau (Lau, Bonnie) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 9, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 64 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2013 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bay Area Legal Aid, California Reinvestment Coalition, Housing and Economic Rights Advocates, Law Foundation of Silicon Valley, National Housing Law Project. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Memorandum of Amici Curiae National Housing Law Project, Housing and Economic Rights Advocates, Bay Area Legal Aid, California Reinvestment Coalition, and Law Foundation of Silicon Valley, # 2 Ex. 1 - Decl. of Glenn Schlactus, # 3 Proposed Order)(Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Kang Qian (Qian, Kent) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Lorraine Crook (Crook, Jamie) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 9, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Schlactus (Schlactus, Glenn) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 60 CLERKS NOTICE Resetting Motion Hearing (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). Reset Hearing as to 53 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 50 MOTION for Leave to File, 44 MOTION for Leave to File. Motions Hearing reset for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (S S Kudenholdt) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (S D Hauser) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (R M Zuckerman) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Reset Deadlines as to 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR RELATED RELIEF. Motions Hearing reset for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 54 REPLY (re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Memorandum, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carpenter, David) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re 50 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae, 44 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 50 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae, 44 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 29, 2013 Filing 51 Request for Judicial Notice re 50 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae filed byAmerican Bankers Association, California Bankers Association, California Credit Union League, California Mortgage Bankers Association. (Related document(s) 50 ) (Hall, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amici Curiae filed by California Bankers Association, American Bankers Association, California Mortgage Bankers Association, California Credit Union League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hall, Paul) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 49 Declaration of John Ertman in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response, 46 Opposition/Response to Motion, 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 46 Motion to Dismiss filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) 45 , 46 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 48 Declaration of Phillip Burnaman, II in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response, 46 Opposition/Response to Motion, 45 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 46 Motion to Dismiss filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s) 45 , 46 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 47 Declaration of Douglas Duncan in Support of 45 Reply to Opposition/Response re Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s) 45 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 46 RESPONSE (re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 45 REPLY (re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Memorandum, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Martin, Sonia) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7964915.) filed by Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc.. (Kudenholdt, Stephen) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7964898.) filed by Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc. (Hauser, Sandra) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7964780.) filed by Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc. (Zuckerman, Richard) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Bryer granting 26 Motion to Relate Case C-13-3664JCS to C-13-3663CRB. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR RELATED RELIEF filed by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/6/2013. Replies due by 9/13/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 37 Proposed Order re 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/23/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 Filing 36 Declaration of Rev. Marvin Webb in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 35 Declaration of Robert Hockett in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 34 Declaration of Peter Dreier in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 33 Declaration of William A. Lindsay in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE (re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Stipulation filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Berzon (Berzon, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Falik (Falik, William) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 28 REPLY (re 25 Ex Parte Application RE: SCHEDULING OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION ) filed byCity of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 27 RESPONSE (re 25 Ex Parte Application RE: SCHEDULING OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION ) filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Proposed Order)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 16, 2013 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Relate Case with Stipulation filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 25 Ex Parte Application RE: SCHEDULING OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION MOTION filed by City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott A. Kronland Dec, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Prince Brown (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Weissglass (Weissglass, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Alan Kronland (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 14, 2013 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Relate Cases filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (D Hallward-Driemeier) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J C Ertman) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 9, 2013 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC served on 8/8/13, answer due 8/29/13. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/9/2013) Modified on 8/12/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2013 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. City of Richmond served on 8/8/13, answer due 8/29/13. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/9/2013) Modified on 8/12/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Douglass Hallward-Driemeier ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7910536.) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John Ertman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7910365.) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 13 Declaration of Ronaldo Reyes in Support of 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 12 Declaration of Kevin Trogdon in Support of 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 11 Declaration of Phillip Burnaman, II in Support of 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Appendix B, # 3 Appendix C, # 4 Appendix D, # 5 Appendix E, # 6 Appendix F)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 10 Declaration of David Stevens in Support of 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 9 Declaration of John Ertman in Support of 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byDeutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 8/22/2013. Replies due by 8/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tsai, Rocky) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 7 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Specific RMBS Trusts At Issue, and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Specific RMBS Trusts At Issue. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association as Trustee for Specific RMBS Trusts At Issue. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Richmond, California, Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 34611088677.) SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint - Part 2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons - City of Richmond, # 4 Summons - Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al v. City of Richmond, California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: John C. Ertman
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeir
Represented By: Thomas Octavian Jacob
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: John C. Ertman
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeir
Represented By: Thomas Octavian Jacob
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: John C. Ertman
Represented By: Douglas Hallward-Driemeir
Represented By: Thomas Octavian Jacob
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond, California
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: William A Falik
Represented By: Scott Alan Kronland
Represented By: Carlos Augusto Privat
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Resolution Partners LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Eric Prince Brown
Represented By: William A Falik
Represented By: Scott Alan Kronland
Represented By: Jonathan David Weissglass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Structured Finance Industry Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra D Hauser
Represented By: Stephen S. Kudenholdt
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Represented By: Richard M. Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Bankers Association
Represented By: Paul James Hall, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Bankers Association
Represented By: Paul James Hall, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Mortgage Bankers Association
Represented By: Paul James Hall, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: California Credit Union League
Represented By: Paul James Hall, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Represented By: David Ryan Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: David Ryan Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?