Reid William Rogers v. F Foulk

Petitioner: Reid William Rogers
Respondent: F. Foulk
Case Number: 3:2013cv03794
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTGENDING DEADLINES 10 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
March 6, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL 9 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/6/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PERMISSION TO FILE LATE OPPOSITION OR LATE APPEAL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/18/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON INITIAL REVIEW (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid William Rogers v. F Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reid William Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: F. Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.