Watershed Asset Management, L.L.C. v. Watershed Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Watershed Asset Management, L.L.C.
Defendant: Watershed Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv03852
Filed: August 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS AND VACATING HEARING. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/21/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MICHELLE MANCINO MARSH PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY MICHELLE MANCINO MARSH by Hon. William Alsup denying 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/9/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watershed Asset Management, L.L.C. v. Watershed Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watershed Asset Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Represented By: Jennifer L. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watershed Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?