Garcia et al v. City of Napa et al

Plaintiff: Perfecto Bauer Garcia and Rudy B. Garcia
Defendant: City of Napa, Richard Melton, Katherine P. Knutsen and Gary Lieberstein
Case Number: 3:2013cv03886
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 9/8/2015. (Certificate of Service attached to docket no. 5 in case no. 15-cv-4045-SK). (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
January 28, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 Objection filed by Perfecto Bauer Garcia, Rudy B. Garcia. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/27/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 15, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 23 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
October 7, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE re 9 Amended Complaint filed by Perfecto Bauer Garcia, Rudy B. Garcia. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia et al v. City of Napa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perfecto Bauer Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy B. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Napa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine P. Knutsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Lieberstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?