November 3, 2015 |
Filing
224
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Judgment in these consolidated actions is entered for defendants and against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/3/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
|
October 1, 2015 |
Filing
222
ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 210 and 212 Motions to Dismiss with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file their third amended complaint, if any, within 30 days of the date of this order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
|
February 27, 2015 |
Filing
205
ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 161 and 164 Motions to Dismiss and denying 160 , 163 , 164 , 182 and 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND except tha t to the extent plaintiffs' Section 11 claims are based on the allegation that Velti's DSO figure was misrepresented in the registration statements, those claims are time-barred and are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All sealing motions filed in conjunction with defendants' motions to dismiss are DENIED. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. The Clerk shall UNSEAL the ACC, Dkt. No. 144, as well as each of the parties' sealing motions, Dkt. Nos. 160, 163, 182, 183. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
|
February 3, 2015 |
Filing
200
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/03/2015. (wholc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
|
October 3, 2014 |
Filing
159
ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The motion to file under seal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If the Settling Defendants still wish to have any p ortions of the complaint filed under seal, they must submit a new declaration within twenty one days of this order that articulates "compelling reasons supported by specific factual findings" that justify sealing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
|
July 8, 2014 |
Filing
131
ORDER CONCERNING 109 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PARTIAL SETTLEMENT -The lead plaintiff should submit any supporting documentation and provide any other information that may be relevant to the determination of whether the proposed settlem ent is fair, reasonable, and adequate by July 22, 2014. If the information will be submitted primarily in the form of a brief, the brief shall not exceed 15 pages. Supporting declarations and exhibits, if any, shall not exceed 25 pages in total. The proponents of the settlement should also file revised Claims and Notice forms by July 22, 2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/08/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing
84
ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL re 83 Notice. Darren J. Robbins, Shawn A. Williams and Danielle S. Myers of Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP are hereby withdrawn as counsel for record. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
80
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF by Judge William H. Orrick re Motions 11 , 14 , 26 , 27 , 28 , 38 , 41 , 43 , and 44 . The Court GRANTS the motion to consolidate. The Court also GRANTS the motion to appoint Lead Plaintiff and appoints Bobby Yadegar/Ygar Capital LLC as the Lead Plaintiff. The Court finds that Yadegar/Ygar Capital LLCs choice of counsel, the Weiser Law Firm, P.C., is reasonable and appoints them as Lead Counsel. The Court will issue a separate Order consolidating the cases, setting forth the master docket and caption, and setting case management deadlines for the filing of a consolidated complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing
69
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2013. Further Case Management Conference continued to 1/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/14/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
|