Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks etc vs Piedmont Lumber et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks & Lumber Handlers Pension Fund
Defendant: Piedmont Lumber & Mill Company, William C. Myer, Jr. and Wendy M Oliver
Case Number: 3:2013cv03898
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 139 Stipulation TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT WITHOUT BOND Re 127 .(terminating 127 motion TO STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT WITHOUT BOND) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr granting 133 Stipulation.(hsglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 106 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEFING IN RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE 94 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/2/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 89 Motion to Continue Trial Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 73 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney with further instruction and orders and setting a Case Management Conference. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES filed by Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks & Lumber Handlers Pension Fund. Discovery due by 12/12/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/9/2015. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/13/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 75 Stipulation filed by Wendy M Oliver. Discovery due by 10/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 4/6/2015 through 4/7/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/18/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY RESPONSES by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER re 63 Order on Stipulation Revising Case Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Dispisitive Motions due by 11/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 2/17/2015 through 2/18/2015 08:30 AM before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/19/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 42 Motion for Leave To Amend Complaint. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria re 38 Discovery Letter Brief and 41 Discovery Letter Brief. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONFIRMING DATE FOR HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 39 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings]. Response due by noon on 4/4/2014. Meet-and-confer from 11:00 AM--1:30 PM in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 4/8/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/3/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 38 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks & Lumber Handlers Pension Fund]. Response due by noon on 4/4/2014. Three-hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room set from 8:00--11:00 AM 4/8/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 4/8/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/1/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 10-cv-1757 SBA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/25/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks etc vs Piedmont Lumber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Ken Lusby Clerks & Lumber Handlers Pension Fund
Represented By: Clarissa A. Kang
Represented By: Sean Travis Strauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Lumber & Mill Company
Represented By: David Richard Johanson
Represented By: Shane Jefferson Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Myer, Jr.
Represented By: David Richard Johanson
Represented By: Shane Jefferson Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy M Oliver
Represented By: David Richard Johanson
Represented By: David Richard Johanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?