Koka v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Moti Koka
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Bank of America N.A. and HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv03930
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Seeborg on 1/17/2014. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AS MODIFIED 12 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due 12/11/2013. Parties must file consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge by 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/8/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koka v. Bank of America N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A.
Represented By: David E. Pinch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moti Koka
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?