Fenerjian v. Nong Shim Company, Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Fenerjian
Defendant: Nong Shim Company, Ltd, Nongshim America, Inc., Ottogi Company, Ltd., Ottogi America, Inc., SamYang Foods Company, Ltd., Sam Yang (U.S.A.), Inc., Korea Yakult and Paldo Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04115
Filed: September 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Preliminary Views on Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/07/2018. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER FOLLOWING APRIL 16, 2018 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick. (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER granting 725 Motion to Shorten time. Deadlines reset as to 724 MOTION Exclude Deposition Testimony of Jung Soo Kim. Responses due by 4/12/2018. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick (to coincide with the Pretrial Conference). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/11/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER DENYING 701 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018) (Entered: 03/23/2018) Modified on 3/23/2018 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick re 541 Motion for Summary Judgment, 548 Motion for Summary Judgment, 581 Motion to Strike, and 602 Administrative Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER granting 572 Stipulation. Reply deadlines continued toy 6/7/2017 re: 541 , 548 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER granting 526 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TO APRIL 5, 2017, THE HEARING ON DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE TRIAL. Motion Hearing continued to 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/23/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 415 , 416 , 420 MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON SANCTIONS MOTIONS - Deadlines reset as to 416 MOTION for Sanctions and 420 MOTION for Sanctions. Responses due by 9/28/2016. Replies due by 10/5/2016. Motion Hearings set for 10/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL TO SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT re All Indirect Purchaser Actions an Samyang Foods Co., Ltd., by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 383 Motion for Settlement. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 384 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting stipulation re extension to file and submit materials required for revised Letters Rogatory to May 13, 2016. 342 , 348 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/2/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Exhibit to 334 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/6/2016. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu re Discovery Letter Briefs 297 , 312 .(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER re 314 STIPULATION REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF SEOUL SHOPPING WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/07/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' request re Letters Rogatory 293 . Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/3/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER approving the form of the draft Letters Rogatory re 293 . Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/19/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER requesting Declarations re Discovery Letter Brief 297 Regarding (1) the location of the depositions of IPPs and (2) search terms to be applied to IPPs custodians. IPPs shall file their declarations by 2/24/16. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/18/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 289 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/27/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER re 247 Letter filed by The Plaza Company. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/14/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re Hearing on Joint Discovery Letter set for December 17, 2015 and Lead Counsel Meet and Confer. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/9/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT AND BAR ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 206 Motion for Settlement. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu re Discovery Letter Briefs 211 and 215 . (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON VARIOUS MOTIONS - Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick as to 206 MOTION for Settlement for Good Faith and Bar Or der, 205 MOTION for Settlement Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, and 207 MOTION for Settlement Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Defendant Samyang Foods Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/28/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING AS MODIFIED 203 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/05/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By August 6, 2015, counsel for Samyang shall respond to this order to show cause to explain counsel's failure to appear. Show Cause Response due by 8/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/04/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified on 8/4/2015 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 8/4/2015 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. By 7/28/15, the parties shall file a detailed joint discovery status statement Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/20/15. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 171 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 168 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER DENYING SAMYANG KOREA'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 142 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER approving 159 Stipulated Confidentiality Protective Order. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Orrick granting 144 Stipulation regarding briefing and hearing schedule for defendant Samyang Food's motion to dismiss indirect purchaser complaint (wholc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE granting 118 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2014. Case Management Conference continued to 12/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS re 80 , 83 , 87 , and 89 Motions to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. If plaintiffs choose to amend either or both of the consolidated complaints, they shall do so by12/3/2014. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/04/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER dismissing Case No. 3:14cv127-WHO as a member case. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/23/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO DETERMINE WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS; APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL; ADOPTING PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE; AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick grantin g (32) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:13-cv-04115-WHO. The Court appoints Izard Nobel LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel. The Court appoints Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP as Interim Plaintiffs Liaison Counsel. A Consolidated Compla int of the Indirect Purchaser Actions shall be filed within 45 days of this Order. All other dates shall be set at the initial Case Management Conference, which shall occur on January 21, 2014 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 2. Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-04115-WHO, 3:13-cv-04296-WHO, 3:13-cv-04308-WHO, 3:13-cv-04335-WHO, 3:13-cv-04898-WHO(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT OTTOGI AMERICA, INC. TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON re 41 Stipulation. Ottogi America shall have an extension of time up to and including January 6, 2014 within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/21/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenerjian v. Nong Shim Company, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Fenerjian
Represented By: Robert A. Izard
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Nobel
Represented By: Alan R. Plutzik
Represented By: Michael Stuart Strimling
Represented By: Nicole Anne Veno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nong Shim Company, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nongshim America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottogi Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ottogi America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SamYang Foods Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Yang (U.S.A.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korea Yakult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paldo Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?