Swearingen et al v. Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mary Swearingen and Robert Figy
Defendant: Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04291
Filed: September 16, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 24 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
July 27, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing., Motions terminated: 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Supplemental Briefing filed by Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/26/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 25, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE, CONTINUING STAY AND DIRECTING FURTHER STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
March 10, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
December 5, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/14 is continued to 3/12/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/4/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
July 1, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND THE JUDGMENT AND/OR FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT 39 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
April 2, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
October 4, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Judge Illston's Standing Order (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 3, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING filed by Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/2/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
September 25, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 20, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swearingen et al v. Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Swearingen
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Figy
Represented By: Ben F. Pierce Gore
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Cruz Natural, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Hawk
Represented By: Stacy R. Hovan
Represented By: J. Christopher Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?