Righetti v. United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Righetti
Defendant: RCI, LLC, United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation, Take you on Vacation, LLC and United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation a foreign corporation doing business as USA Travel Services
Case Number: 3:2013cv04328
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT TAKE YOU ON VACATION, LLC re #63 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Michael Righetti, #62 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 10, 2015 Filing 63 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Righetti & Rex Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT TAKE YOU ON VACATION, LLC SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Show Cause Response due by 7/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2015 is vacated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 28, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 17, 2015 Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 6/17/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 60 DEFAULT JUDGMENT Entered by Clerk re #58 Application for Default Judgment by Clerk. (tnS) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 21, 2015 Filing 59 [Proposed] Default Judgment re #58 APPLICATION for Default Judgment by the Clerk filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
March 13, 2015 Filing 58 APPLICATION for Default Judgment by the Clerk filed by Michael Righetti. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Jones, Charles) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/25/2015 is continued to 7/1/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Case Management Statement is due by 6/17/2015. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 56 Clerk's DECLINATION of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk. (Related documents(s) #55 ) (tnS) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 55 APPLICATION for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Michael Righetti. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration)(Jones, Charles) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
March 11, 2015 Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 3/11/2015)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCEAt Plaintiff's request, the case management conference currently scheduled for January 21, 2015 is continued to March 25, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. A joint case management statement is due ten court days beforehand. The Court will not entertain further requests for continuance.If Plaintiff intends to amend his complaint, he must do so by March 9, 2015. Any amendment after that will require a showing of good cause. Plaintiff should also expect at the March 25 hearing that the Court will order Plaintiff to file a motion for default judgment as to any defendants who have been named in the current complaint but not yet appeared.(Entered by Judge Jon S. Tigar) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 14, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2015. Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
January 7, 2015 Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
October 2, 2014 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/15/2014 is CONTINUED to 1/21/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement is due by 1/7/2015. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 50 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT of United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation dba USA Travel Services (Related documents(s) #48 )(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION for Entry of Default of United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation dba USA Travel Services filed by Michael Righetti. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles A. Jones ISO Plaintiffs' Request to Enter Default Against Defendant United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation, D/B/A USA Travel Services)(Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 10/1/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/3/2014 is CONTINUED to 10/15/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. A Joint Case Management Statement is due by 10/1/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 20, 2014 Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Righetti. United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation served on 8/14/2014, answer due 9/4/2014. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 13, 2014 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Righetti. Take you on Vacation, LLC served on 7/24/2014, answer due 8/14/2014. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 43 Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Take you on Vacation, LLC. (tnS) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 42 Summons on Third Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation. (tnS) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 41 Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 40 Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 39 THIRD AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corp., Take you on Vacation, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Righetti. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2014. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014).
June 18, 2014 Filing 37 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for: (1) Allowing Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint, (2) Dismissing Defendant RCI, LLC from this Action, Without Prejudice, and (3) Continue Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Righetti (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 Filing 34 JOINT STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 3/5/2014). Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice (Paula J. Morency); (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-8404784.) filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 19, 2014 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byRCI, LLC. (Chaiken, Tal) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/26/2014 is CONTINUED to 3/5/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 2/19/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
January 9, 2014 Notice terminating #19 Motion to Dismiss. (jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.)(Filed on 1/9/2014)
December 31, 2013 Filing 26 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against RCI, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #24 Stipulation to File Second Amended Complaint.The Initial Case Management Conference will remain as scheduled.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 23, 2013 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by RCI, LLC, Michael Righetti. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 23 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013) Modified on 12/18/2013 (lrc, COURT STAFF). DISREGARD THIS NOTICE FILED IN WRONG CASE!! Modified on 12/19/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2013 Filing 22 Declaration of Charles A. Jones In Support of Plaintiff's re #21 Statement of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 21 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to (re #19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint and [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint) filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 20 [Proposed] Order Granting re #19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/16/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 12/2/2013).
November 27, 2013 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Due to the Court's unavailability, the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/19/2014 is CONTINUED to 2/26/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The Joint Case Management Statement is due by 2/12/2014. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tal Cohen Chaiken (Chaiken, Tal) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 18, 2013 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial against RCI, LLC. Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Stipulation.The Court adopts the parties' briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss. The Initial Case Management Conference shall be continued to February 19, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. The Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than February 4, 2014.(jstlc1, COURT STAFF) (This is a text only entry.) (Filed on 11/14/2013).
November 14, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RCI, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by RCI, LLC, Michael Righetti. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint filed by RCI, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 12/12/2013. Replies due by 1/9/2014. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 24, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) filed by RCI, LLC. (Youngblood, Sarah) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/8/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Righetti. RCI, LLC served on 10/4/2013, answer due 10/25/2013. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Righetti.. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RCI. LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Michael Righetti . (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of the Telephone Consumer Protection Act; Demand for Jury Trial against RCI. LLC. (Filing Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt Number 0971-8012864) Filed by Michael Righetti. (Jones, Charles) (Filed on 9/18/2013) Modified on 9/19/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righetti v. United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCI, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Diane Youngblood-Bates
Represented By: Rocky N. Unruh
Represented By: Tal Cohen Chaiken
Represented By: Paula J Morency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Take you on Vacation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Shuttle Alliance Transportation Corporation a foreign corporation doing business as USA Travel Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Righetti
Represented By: Charles Aubrey Jones
Represented By: Kelly A. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?