Guilbaud et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith and Michael Wong
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation and Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04357
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Filing 182 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/15/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria Granting (177) Motion for Settlement and Awarding Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards re (178) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2016 re #177 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CALIFORNIA CLASS filed by Michael Smith, Michael Wong, Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, #178 MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS filed by Michael Smith, Michael Wong, Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly. There are no objections to the settlement. The Court approves the class settlement. The Court will issue a written ruling re the Motion for Attorney Fees. FTR Time 10:02- 10:10. Plaintiff Attorney Carolyn Cottrell, Nicole Coon, Ryan Hicks, and Michael Righetti. Defendant Attorney Matthew Kane. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 179 Declaration of Scott M. Fenwick in Support of #177 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CALIFORNIA CLASS filed byOlivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong. (Related document(s) #177 ) (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 178 MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS filed by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/4/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Index of Evidence, #2 Exh. P01 - Declaration of Olivia Guilbaud, #3 Exh. P02 - Declaration of Marques Lilly, #4 Exh. P03 - Declaration of Michael Wong, #5 Exh. P04 - Declaration of Michael Smith, #6 Exh. SW01 - Declaration of Carolyn Hunt Cottrell, #7 Exhs. SW02-SW08, #8 Exhs. SW09-SW12, #9 Exhs. SW13-SW24, #10 Exh. HH01 - Declaration of Richard Hoyer, #11 Exhs. HH02-HH07, #12 Exh. RG01 - Declaration of Matthew Righetti, #13 Exhs. RG02-RG07, #14 Signatory Attestation and Certificate of Service)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 177 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CALIFORNIA CLASS filed by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 4/4/2016. Replies due by 4/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn Hunt Cottrell, #2 Proposed Judgment, #3 Proposed Order)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 176 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Wong of FIRM NAME CHANGE of HOYER & ASSOCIATES (Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #174 Stipulation to Amend Deadlines in January 15, 2016 Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Settlement as to CA Class and Approval of Settlement as to Collective.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 174 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO AMEND DEADLINES IN JANUARY 15, 2016 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CALIFORNIA CLASS AND APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO COLLECTIVE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith. (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 173 CLERK'S NOTICE re denial of motion to relate cases. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 172 RESPONSE (re #171 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) GUILBAUD PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byOlivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith. (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 171 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (166) Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-04357-VC, 3:14-cv-02642-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 169 Proposed Order re #166 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO CALIFORNIA CLASS AND APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AS TO COLLECTIVE by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 168 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2016. re #166 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Michael Smith. Fairness Hearing; Motion for Final Approval; Motion for Attorneys' Fees Hearing set for 4/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria.FTR Time 10:01 - 10:09 = 8 minutes. Plaintiff Attorney Nicole Coon, Carolyn Hunt Cottrell, Michael Righetti. Defendant Attorney Matthew Kane. Attachment Civil Minutes.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2016)
December 15, 2015 Filing 167 NOTICE by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. of Proposed Class Action Settlement Pursuant to Class Action Fairness Act. 28 U.S.C. 1715 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 166 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Michael Smith. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 12/21/2015. Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Declaration Declaration of CHC iso Motion for Preliminary Approval, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Preliminary Approval)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #164 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in May 20, 2015 Order.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/29/2016. Class Cert. Motions due by 1/22/2016. Motion Hearing Re Class Cert. set for 3/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 16, 2015 Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES IN MAY 20, 2015 ORDER filed by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Carolyn Hunt Cottrell in Support of Stipulation to Extend Deadlines)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 13, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE of Change of Address by Carolyn Hunt Cottrell NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR TODD MICHAEL SCHNEIDER, CAROLYN HUNT COTTRELL, AND NICOLE NELLESSEN COON (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Esquivel v. SUMC) (Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 25, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff, Bryan Pritchett (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 160 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadlines in December 16, 2014 Order. Discovery due by 4/29/2016. Class Certification Motions due by 10/7/2015. Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/20/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff Carlos Sarmiento (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 12, 2015 Filing 157 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joanne Elizabeth MacMillan re Truc T. Nguyen (MacMillan, Joanne) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing of Consents to Join Collective Action by Nos. 2083 and 2084 (M.A. Phillips and P. Ponder) (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 8, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Withdrawal of A. Chowning Poppler as Attorney of Record (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 154 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines in Dec. 16, 2014 Order filed by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Carolyn Hunt Cottrell Declaration In Support of Stipulation to Extend Deadlines in Dec 16, 2014 Order)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 153 NOTICE by Michael Smith re #122 Notice (Other),, of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff and Declaration of Azhia S. Long (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 30, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff, Mark Ferrara (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 16, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff, Chen Fan (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
April 15, 2015 Filing 149 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/15/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 148 NOTICE by Michael Smith re #122 Notice (Other),, of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff, Maria Raibley (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
April 9, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 146 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong re #119 Notice (Other),,,, of Withdrawal of Opt In Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rick Darr ISO Notice of Withdrawal of Opt In Form)(Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
April 2, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 4/2/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 144 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 143 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 26, 2015 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne Elizabeth MacMillan (MacMillan, Joanne) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 24, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 18, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 18, 2015 Filing 139 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action of Courtney Bentley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 138 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action of Jose Pena and Cesar Cereceres (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 137 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 16, 2015 Filing 136 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 135 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
March 2, 2015 Filing 134 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
February 24, 2015 Filing 133 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 132 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 10, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 2, 2015 Filing 130 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RE DISCOVERY OF EMPLOYEES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/2/2015. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 128 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JANUARY 20, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE EMAIL ADDRESSES by Michael Smith. (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 127 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFF (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 126 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/20/2015. No one appeared on behalf of the Eastern District of CA case. Plaintiff to prepare proposed order and allow for defendant's review regarding the personal email addresses of former employees and current employees as stated in open court. Not reported or recorded. Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Righetti, Nicole Coon, and Carolyn Cottrell. Defendant Attorney Matthew Kane and John Van Hook. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 124 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 19, 2015 Filing 123 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong re #120 Notice (Other) RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew Righetti)(Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 1/19/2015)
January 13, 2015 Filing 122 NOTICE by Michael Smith NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 13, 2015 Filing 121 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 13, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 9, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice Of Filing Consent To Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 118 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (116) Stipulated Protective Order in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-04357-VC, 3:14-cv-02642-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2015) Modified on 1/2/2015 (knm, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2014 Filing 116 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order filed by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 12/26/2014)
December 16, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE by Michael Smith Of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opt In Consent Form of Devin Eley)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/18/2015. Class Certification Motion due by 6/16/2015. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/16/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 10, 2014 Filing 113 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Michael Smith. Amendment to #107 Notice (Other) of Joint Proposed Schedule. (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying (62) Motion to Strike in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Olivia Guilbaud for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 110 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 11/20/14, before Judge Vince Chhabria. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:05 - 11:30. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #109 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2015. (Related documents(s) #109 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by Michael Smith Of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Latrice Collins Opt-In Consent)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE by Michael Smith Joint Proposed Schedule (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 106 AMENDED ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying (83) Motion for Protective Order in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC, and issuing deadlines for filing. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing re #83 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Olivia Guilbaud held on 11/20/2014. (Date Filed: 11/20/2014) The Court will issue an order denying the motion. FTR Time 11:05- 11:30. Plaintiff Attorney Matthew Righetti, Ryan Hicks, Michael Righetti, and Nicole Coon. Defendant Attorney Matthew Kane and John Van Hook. This is a text only Minute Entry (knm, COURT STAFF)
November 18, 2014 Filing 103 Response re #102 Notice (Other), Defendant Sprint/United Management Companys Objection To, Motion To Strike And Preliminary Opposition To Plaintiffs Request For A Civil Contempt Order [Dkt. #102] bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by Michael Smith re #79 Order on Motion to Certify Class Plaintiffs Request For A Civil Contempt Order Holding Defendant In Contempt For Failing To Produce Proposed Collective Members Information Pursuant To The Courts October 3, 2014 Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn Cottrell, #2 Proposed Order)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
November 11, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE by Michael Smith Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action of Jalisha Lamb (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting (72) Motion to Strike in case 3:13-cv-04357-VC. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE by Michael Smith of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action of Brandon Marshall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 98 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING RE #72 MOTION TO STRIKE, SET FOR HEARING ON NOVEMBER 6, 2014. The Court will rule on the motion based on the briefs filed by the parties. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 Filing 97 REPLY (re #83 MOTION for Protective Order ) TO LIMIT DEFENDANTS COMMUNICATIONS WITH EMPLOYEES DURING THE NOTICE AND OPT-IN PERIOD CORRECTION OF DOCKET #96 filed byOlivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 96 REPLY (re #83 MOTION for Protective Order ) TO LIMIT DEFENDANT'S COMMUNICATIONS WITH EMPLOYEES DURING THE NOTICE AND OPT-IN PERIOD filed byOlivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 95 RESPONSE (re #83 MOTION for Protective Order ) filed bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 94 REPLY (re #72 MOTION to Strike #56 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Defendant's Affirmative Defenses in Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Strike filed byMichael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mike Righetti ISO Motion to Strike)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 93 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE HEARING RE #62 MOTION TO STRIKE, SET FOR HEARING ON OCTOBER 30, 2014. The Court will rule on the motion based on the briefs filed by the parties. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 92 Renotice motion hearing re #83 MOTION for Protective Order , #84 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order Second Amended Notice of Motion filed byOlivia Guilbaud. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #83 , #84 ) (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #72 MOTION to Strike #56 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Defendant's Affirmative Defenses in Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), #83 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 91 RESPONSE (re #72 MOTION to Strike #56 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Defendant's Affirmative Defenses in Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) ) filed bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 12, 2014 Filing 89 CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/02/2014, before Judge VINCE CHHABRIA. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number (415)504-4204 or email: margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #78 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2015. (Related documents(s) #78 ) (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. re #86 Letter, #79 Order on Motion to Certify Class DEFENDANT SPRINT/UNITED MANAGEMENT COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED NOTICE OF COLLECTIVE ACTION LAWSUIT PURSUANT TO COURT'S OCTOBER 3, 2014 ORDER (DKT. #79) (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud re #83 MOTION for Protective Order Amended Notice of Motion (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 86 Letter from Plaintiffs Re: Proposed FLSA Notice and Opt In Form . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Proposed Opt In Form, #3 Exhibit Meet and Confer Correspondence)(Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying #84 Motion to Shorten Time.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 83 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Olivia Guilbaud. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/22/2014. Replies due by 10/29/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE by Michael Smith re #71 Answer to to CounterClaim, NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS PROTECTIVE COUNTERCLAIMS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 81 ** See corrected transcript at docket entry #89. ** Transcript of Proceedings of Electronic Sound Recording held on 10/02/14, before Judge VINCE CHHABRIA. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number (415)504-4204 or email: margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #78 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2015. (Related documents(s) #78 ) (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014) Modified on 10/14/2014 (djc, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Protective Counterclaims by Defendant/Counterclaimant Sprint/United Management Company Pursuant to FRCP 41(c) by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part #53 Motion to Certify Class (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Schneider NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR ALL PLAINTIFFS (Schneider, Todd) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Nellessen Coon NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TODD M. SCHNEIDER AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 10/2/2014) re #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) filed by Michael Smith. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2015. Motions due by 2/26/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (FTR recording: 10:01- 10:31 and 10:48- 11:16.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 74 REPLY (re #62 MOTION to Strike #60 Letter, #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, #57 Amended Document, #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Secti ) filed bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting #66 Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike #56 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Defendant's Affirmative Defenses in Amended Answer to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) filed by Olivia Guilbaud. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/14/2014. Replies due by 10/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 71 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #56 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs; Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Protective Counterclaims Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) byOlivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith, Michael Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION to Strike #60 Letter, #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, #57 Amended Document, #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Secti ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike filed byOlivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 69 RESPONSE (re #66 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply, #62 MOTION to Strike #60 Letter, #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, #57 Amended Document, #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Secti ) filed bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS to re #65 Errata, Plaintiffs Late-Filed Reply Supplemental Declaration Of Marques Lilly And Arguments Based Thereon In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 67 RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION to Strike #60 Letter, #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, #57 Amended Document, #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Secti ) Opposition to Request for Order Shortening Time filed byOlivia Guilbaud. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 22, 2014 Filing 65 ERRATA Notice Of Errata Regarding Supplemental Declaration Of Marques Lilly In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification And To Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Marques Lilly)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
September 18, 2014 Filing 64 OBJECTIONS to re #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, Plaintiffs Reply Evidence and Arguments Based Thereon In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 63 Letter from Counsel for Sprint/United Management Company . (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION to Strike #60 Letter, #58 Reply to Opposition/Response,,,, #57 Amended Document, #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) filed by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/1/2014. Replies due by 10/8/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b). Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. The deadlines for filing briefs shall remain unchanged. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 60 Letter from Plaintiff Olivia Guilbaud, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Nellessen Coon Notice of Appearance of Nicole N. Coon as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff Michael Smith (Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 58 REPLY (re #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) ) filed byMichael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Matthew Righetti In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification And To Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b), #2 Declaration Declaration Of Carolyn H. Cottrell In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification And To Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b), #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response To Defendant's Evidentiary Objections In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification And To Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b), #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Conditional Certification And To Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b))(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 57 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Smith. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2014) Modified on 9/9/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2014 Filing 56 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint #50 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM ;and Protective Demand for Jury Trial against All Plaintiffs bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 55 RESPONSE (re #53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) ) filed bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Objections to Proposed Notice, #3 Appendix of Evidence, #4 Exhibit 1 to Appendix - Bernstein, #5 Exhibit 2 to Appendix - Brown, #6 Exhibit 3 to Appendix - Gittleman, #7 Exhibit 4 to Appendix - Gonzalez, #8 Exhibit 5 to Appendix - Hynes, #9 Exhibit 6 to Appendix - Kandola, #10 Exhibit 7 to Appendix - Kuo, #11 Exhibit 8 to Appendix - Lane, #12 Exhibit 9 to Appendix - Matoza, #13 Exhibit 10 to Appendix - Morales, #14 Exhibit 11 to Appendix - Olivera, #15 Exhibit 12 to Appendix - Peyton, #16 Exhibit 13 to Appendix - Rigdon, #17 Exhibit 14 to Appendix - Rivera, #18 Exhibit 15 to Appendix - Tilan, #19 Exhibit 16 to Appendix - Fox, #20 Exhibit 17 to Appendix - Guy, #21 Exhibit 18 to Appendix - Nelis, #22 Exhibit 19 to Appendix - Parks, #23 Exhibit 20 to Appendix - Watson, #24 Exhibits A-Z to Watson Declaration, #25 Exhibits AA-BC to Watson Declaration, #26 Exhibits BD-BI to Watson Declaration, #27 Exhibit 21 to Appendix - Van Hook)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff Michael Smith's ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 53 MOTION to Certify Class Notice of Motion and Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b) filed by Michael Smith. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/4/2014. Replies due by 9/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Carolyn H. Cottrell In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216 (b), #2 Exhibit Declaration of Carolyn H. Cottrell In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216 (b) Exhs A to H, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan L. Hicks In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216 (b), #4 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan L. Hicks In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216 (b) Exhs A to F, #5 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification and to Facilitate Notice Under 29 U.S.C. Section 216(b))(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action by Michael Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alexander, Desi Opt-In Consent Form)(Coon, Nicole) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/20/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint (Consolidated Collection and Class Action Complaint) and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL bySprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2014 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Collective and Class Action Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byMichael Smith. (Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #47 MOTION to Relate Case and Consolidate Cases by Stipulation filed by Michael Smith. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/10/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 48 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/8/2014 before Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 7/9/2014). #47 MOTION to Relate Case 13-cv-4357-VC and 14-cv-2642-EDL and Consolidate Cases by Stipulation filed by Michael Smith is GRANTED. Discovery due by 6/19/2015. Class Certification Motion due by 12/5/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 9/14/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2015 (4-6 weeks) 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. (Not reported or recorded.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 47 MOTION to Relate Case and Consolidate Cases by Stipulation filed by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 2, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Alexis Beldner (Beldner, Sabrina) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014) Modified on 7/2/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Filing 44 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING THE LOCATION OF THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE CHANGING THE TIME FOR HEARING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 7/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER vacating class certification deadline and setting case management conference. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on June 3, 2014. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
May 30, 2014 Filing 41 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Motion for Administrative Relief and Supporting Stipulation Seeking Modification of Pretrial Schedule. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE CORRECTING DATE OF THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 3/5/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Selection set for 5/4/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2015 through 5/15/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/27/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 38 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 5/27/2014). (Court Reporter Not reported.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 37 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 36 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 5/6/2014) Modified on 5/6/2014 (farS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Vince Chhabria, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 3/20/2014) Modified on 3/21/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Sprint Nextel Corporation. Filed byMichael Wong, Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly. (Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting #32 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUESTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly, Michael Wong. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ORDER RE WITHDRAWING MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT. #29] WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AND VACATING FEBRUARY 6 HEARING by Judge Alsup finding as moot #29 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting #30 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT#29] WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Hook, John) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 27, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 1/10/2014. Replies due by 1/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy P. O'Grady in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/27/2013) Modified on 12/27/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2013 Filing 28 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint by Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 12/27/2013) Modified on 12/27/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #27 Case Management Scheduling Order. Jury Selection set for 3/16/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
December 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2014. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 1/29/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/23/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/19/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 12/19/2013). Jury Selection set for 3/26/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 13, 2013 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing Time. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2013 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byOlivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Summons Second Amended)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RE MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Olivia Guilbaud. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 6, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order REGARDING DEFENDANT SPRINT/UNITED MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6), 12(f) and/or 23(d)(1)(D) filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/6/2013. Replies due by 12/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #8 Amended Complaint to Extend Specially Appearing Defendant Sprint Corporation's Time to Respond filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (Van Hook, John) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE by Olivia Guilbaud of Consent to Join Collective Action (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 13 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by all Plaintiffs (Hicks, Ryan) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Olivia Guilbaud Proof of Service of Process Server of Service of Complaint ect. on Sprint Nextel Corp. and Sprint/United Management Co. (Attachments: #1 proof of service of process server)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 30, 2013 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Olivia Guilbaud. (Attachments: #1 Summons FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS)(Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/30/2013) Modified on 10/30/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/17/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Olivia Guilbaud.. (Righetti, Matthew) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of California Labor Code against Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint/United Management Co., Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00., Receipt Number 34611089856). Filed by Michael Wong, Olivia Guilbaud, Marques Lilly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guilbaud et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Guilbaud
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Nicole Nellessen Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marques Lilly
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Nicole Nellessen Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Nicole Nellessen Coon
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wong
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Michael C. Righetti
Represented By: Todd Michael Schneider
Represented By: Nicole Nellessen Coon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Truc T Nguyen
Represented By: John Arthur Van Hook
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Truc T Nguyen
Represented By: John Arthur Van Hook
Represented By: Sabrina Alexis Beldner
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Joanne Elizabeth MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?