Manalang et al v. Macy's Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ed Manalang and Josie Manalang
Defendant: Fagor America Inc and Macy's Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv04374
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Thelton E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2014 Filing 37 [FILED UNDER SEAL]...Transcript of Proceedings Held on 5/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (tnS) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 22, 2014 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held. Case settled (Date Filed: 5/6/2014). (Digital FTR Recording: 11:34-11:40 (under seal)) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/6/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/17/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE filed by Fagor America Inc. of Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney; [Proposed] Order (Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/14/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Melissa Ippolito; Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney; [Proposed] Order (Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference previously set for Monday, 04/07/2014. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 6/2/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference previously set for 3/17/14 at 9:00 AM has been re-set for 5/6/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 27 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement conference remains on calendar for 3/17/14. Counsel to advise clients and report back to the Court. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 26 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court will initiate the phone contact. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 Filing 25 Declaration of Melissa D. Ippolito In Support of Good Faith Efforts to Schedule Mandatory Settlement Conference; Notice of Unavailability of Client Representative filed byFagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/17/2014 at *09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/17/2014. *Please note time change.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE filed by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang; Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Martin, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 21 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 1/9/14 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. Court will set a further settlement conference to take place in the next 60 days.. Court will advise the parties of the date after 1/15/14. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 20 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Arbitration Filed by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc filed by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. (Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 20, 2013 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 3/10/14 at 9:30 AM has been advanced to 1/9/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 3/10/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/20/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/18/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 15 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2013 before Thelton E. Henderson (Date Filed: 12/16/2013) re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 9(6), 12 (b)(6) and for a more definite statement (FRCP 12(e)) filed by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 14 REPLY (re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 9(6), 12 (b)(6) and for a more definite statement (FRCP 12(e)) ) filed byFagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Berla, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Benny Martin in Support of re #12 Opposition/Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Part1, #2 Exhibit A_Part2)(Related document(s) #12 ) (Martin, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 12 RESPONSE to (re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 9(6), 12 (b)(6) and for a more definite statement (FRCP 12(e))); Joint Opposition filed by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang. (Martin, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 8, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 9(6), 12 (b)(6) and for a more definite statement (FRCP 12(e)) filed by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 11/22/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Melissa D. Ippolito in support of Defendants Macy's, Inc and Fagor America, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 9(b), 12(b)(6) and for more definite statement (FRCP 12(e)), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 1, 2013 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/17/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 8 STIPULATION extending time to file a first responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ippolito, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Thelton E. Henderson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/17/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 4 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fagor America Inc, Macy's Inc (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt No. 34611089881). Filed by Ed Manalang, Josie Manalang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manalang et al v. Macy's Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Manalang
Represented By: Benjamin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Manalang
Represented By: Benjamin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fagor America Inc
Represented By: Melissa Ippolito
Represented By: William Murray Hake
Represented By: Jeremy Christopher Berla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Inc
Represented By: Melissa Ippolito
Represented By: William Murray Hake
Represented By: Jeremy Christopher Berla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?