Canonico et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Ursula Canonico and Giovanni Canonico
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Assurant, Inc. and American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2013cv04381
Filed: September 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:1971
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/30/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset Deadline for Joint Status Conference Statement filed by Giovanni Canonico, Ursula Canonico, Patrick Ursomano. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 45 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Motion hearing and case management conference scheduled for 2/27/2014 is VACATED. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER establishing briefing schedule on defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Assurant, Inc., American Security Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Withdrawal Count I of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Giovanni Canonico, Ursula Canonico. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 MOTION to Dismiss , 26 Clerks Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,,, to modify briefing schedule filed by Assurant, Inc., American Security Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canonico et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Insurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Canonico
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Represented By: Peter Anthony Muhic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Canonico
Represented By: Peter Anthony Muhic
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?