Jobscience, Inc. v. CVPartners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jobscience, Inc.
Defendant: Skipan Saas LLC, Skipan LLC, CVPartners, Inc., Brandon Metcalf and Kent Gray
Case Number: 3:2013cv04519
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 86 Letter filed by Jobscience, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/18/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 84 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Kent Gray, CVPartners, Inc., Brandon Metcalf, Skipan Saas LLC, Skipan LLC]. Responses due by noon 8/19/2014. Three-hour meet -and-confer in Court's jury room starting from 8:00 a.m.--11:00 a.m. 8/20/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 8/21/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/14/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF REGARDING SOFTWARE CODE ANALYSIS ORDER. re 75 Letter; re 81 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 7, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 75 Discovery Letter Brief filed by CVPartners, Inc.]. Responses due by 5:00 ON 6/24/2014. 2-1/2-Hour meet-and-confer in Court's jury room starting from 9:00-11:30 AM on 6/26/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 6/26/2014 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/23/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS CLAIM AND ORDER RE SOURCE-CODE COMPARISON by Judge Alsup re 51 Motion to Strike ; 54 ; 59 ; 62 ; 66 Discovery Letter Brief (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE REGARDING UPCOMING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH re 55 First MOTION to Shorten Time to Bring Motion to Quash Subpoena and For Protective Order filed by Jobscience, Inc., 56 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Jobscience, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 10, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE HEARING (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 39 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge Willam Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING re 7 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Jobscience, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/23/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jobscience, Inc. v. CVPartners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skipan Saas LLC
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skipan LLC
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVPartners, Inc.
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Metcalf
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Gray
Represented By: Rajiv Sajjan Dharnidharka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobscience, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Michael Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?