Mccullough et al v. Xerox Corporation

Plaintiff: Sakeenah Mccullough and Daniel Gunther
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Case Number: 3:2013cv04596
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 134 Stipulated Dismissal with Prejudice.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 23, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL, See Docket No. 132 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/23/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
December 3, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 98 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 17, 2015 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
October 9, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2015. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/9/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
October 8, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER.Motions due by 11/2/2015; Responses due by 11/16/2015; Replies due by 11/23/2015; Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(Grant in part/deny in part 75 STIPULATION). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/8/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 2, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 41 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, REGARDING SAKEENAH MCCULLOUGH (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
January 26, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION for Leave to File Two Motions for Summary Judgment and Extend Deadlines. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, O akland. Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2015 Responses due by 4/3/2015. Replies due by 4/17/2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/26/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015) Modified on 1/27/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION CONTINUING THE PARTIES' DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION AND FACT DISCOVERY. Discovery due by 12/19/2014.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/27/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
May 28, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
March 24, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION RE: Deadline to Complete Court Sponsored Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mccullough et al v. Xerox Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sakeenah Mccullough
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise Riles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Gunther
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise Riles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Janine Syll Simerly
Represented By: Bethany Anne Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?