Van Curen v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation et al

Plaintiff: John Van Curen
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation and Risk Management Agency
Case Number: 3:2013cv04601
Filed: October 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 66 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 75 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion to Continue. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
June 22, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting re 55 Request to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Risk Management Agency, Federal Crop Insurance Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 20, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granted 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by John Van Curen. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
April 22, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/22/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 21, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 29 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
December 20, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/20/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Curen v. Federal Crop Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Van Curen
Represented By: Merle Cooper Meyers
Represented By: David Clarke Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Crop Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Risk Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?