Demelo et al v. National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christina Demelo and Roslyn Marshall
Defendant: National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. and Insperity Peo Services, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04684
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Insperity Peo Services, L.P., National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 25 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 7/14/2014, case settled, mediation complete. By Mediator, Linda McSweyn, dated 7/14/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re Attendance at Mediation by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 7/14/2014 10:30 AM., at the Federal Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Letter filed by Christina Demelo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 18, 2014 Filing 21 Letter from Plaintiff Re: Request to be Excused from In-Person Meet and Confer for Discovery Disputes . (Korobkin, Tuvia) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
April 24, 2014 CLERKS NOTICE RE: CHAMBERS COPIESThis is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this noticeThe parties are hereby advised that they do not need to submit chambers copies, with the exception of documents that (1) are related to a pending motion and/or discovery dispute and (2) exceed 10 pages when combined. (For example, if there is a 20-page stipulation and proposed order, no chambers copy is required.) For these documents only, the submitting party shall comply with Civil Local Rule 5-1(e)(7). All chambers copies should be double-sided (when possible) and include (1) the ECF running header at the top of each page, and (2) exhibits, if any, that are clearly delineated with tabbed dividers. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #19 Stipulation to Extend Mediation Deadline to July 14, 2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline to July 14, 2014 filed by Insperity Peo Services, L.P., National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 7, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman Director, ADR Program on 3/6/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 28, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 3/4/2014 has been rescheduled to 3/6/2014 at 10:30 AM. Call-in information remains the same. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 18 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, March 4, 2014 at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 7, 2014 Filing 17 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Linda McSweyn as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting #7 Stipulation selecting Mediation (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/25/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 12/24/2014. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2015. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2015 - 6/26/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/7/2014. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Insperity Peo Services, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Insperity, Inc. for Insperity Peo Services, L.P.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 12 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Insperity Peo Services, L.P., National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christina Demelo, Roslyn Marshall (Korobkin, Tuvia) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 19, 2013 Filing 10 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Insperity PEO Services, L.P. and Counsel (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 9 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. and Counsel (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 8 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Korobkin, Tuvia) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 18, 2013 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Christina Demelo, Roslyn Marshall filed by Christina Demelo, Roslyn Marshall. (Korobkin, Tuvia) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 6 Statement Request for Telephone Appearance by Defendants National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. and Insperity PEO Services, L.P.; Order by Insperity Peo Services, L.P., National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc.. (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 Letter filed by Christina Demelo. Signed by Maria-Elena James on 12/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 12, 2013 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel requesting to appear telephonically at the CMC. (Korobkin, Tuvia) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Insperity Peo Services, L.P., National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Wilbur, Michael) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is RG 13691092. ( Filing fee $400-#446110945 ). Filed byNational Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc., Insperity Peo Services, L.P.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2013: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demelo et al v. National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Demelo
Represented By: Michael Bryant Eisenberg,
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roslyn Marshall
Represented By: Michael Bryant Eisenberg,
Represented By: Tuvia Korobkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Ovarian Cancer Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Bednarova
Represented By: Michael W. Foster
Represented By: Michael E. Wilbur
Represented By: Michael Eugene Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insperity Peo Services, L.P.
Represented By: Andrea Bednarova
Represented By: Michael W. Foster
Represented By: Michael E. Wilbur
Represented By: Michael Eugene Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?