Aylus Networks, Inc. v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Aylus Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04700
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2016 Filing 284 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion 283 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 283 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/9/2016. Replies due by 5/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 18, 2016 Filing 282 Costs Taxed in amount of $69,046.45, Re: ECF No. 276, against Aylus Networks, Inc. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 256 Defendant's Motion to Seal.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 257 Defendant's Motion for Attorney's Fees.(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 279 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2016 re 257 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc. filed by Apple Inc. Court took matter under submission and to issue order.Total Time in Court 15. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff Attorney Amar Thakur. Defendant Attorney Mark Fowler, Christine Corbett, and Erik Fuehrer. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 277 EXHIBITS re 276 Bill of Costs, Exhibit E to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 276 ) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 276 BILL OF COSTS (AMENDED) by Apple Inc.. Objections due by 3/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 275 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 REDACTED Version of Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 4 UNREDACTED Version of Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 5 REDACTED Version of Exhibit C to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit C to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 7 REDACTED Version of Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 8 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 274 CLERK'S NOTICE: On February 25, 2016 counsel filed an Amended Bill of Costs, ECF No. 271. Supporting itemization and documentation required by Civil Local Rule 54-1(a) are missing. A complete set of exhibits should be filed in support of the Amended Bill of Costs. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 270 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 272 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 271 BILL OF COSTS (AMENDED) by Apple Inc.. Objections due by 3/10/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (supplemental) of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 2 Exhibit A - Amended, # 3 Exhibit B - Amended, # 4 Exhibit C - Amended, # 5 Exhibit D - Amended)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal the Supplemental Christine Corbett Declaration and Amended Schedule D, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal the Supplemental Christine Corbett Declaration and Amended Schedule D, # 3 Redacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Amended Bill of Costs Waiving Certain Costs)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 269 REPLY (re 257 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc. ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply to Aylus Networks, Inc. Opposition to Motion for an Exceptional Case Finding and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, # 2 Exhibit A)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 261 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 267 USCA Case Number 16-1599 for 259 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 266 Proposed Order re 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Granting Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal its Objections to Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 265 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal its Objections to Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 261 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 264 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 253 Bill of Costs, Notice of Intent to Waive Certain Costs From its Bill of Costs (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 254 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 262 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals as to 259 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2016: # 1 Receipt) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2016 Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Aylus's (Unredacted) Objections to Apple's Bill Of Costs, # 4 Aylus's (Redacted) Objections to Apple's Bill of Costs)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 260 RESPONSE (re 257 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc. ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 259 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit as to 246 Order,, 247 Judgment by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 25Q1A6EO. Appeal Record due by 3/21/2016. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 2/18/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-1599)
February 4, 2016 Filing 258 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Corrected) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 256 ) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 257 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc. filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/18/2016. Replies due by 2/25/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion for an Exceptional Case Finding and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc., # 6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 256 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Documents, # 2 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Documents, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Documents, # 4 Redacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Motion for an Exceptional Case Finding and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, # 5 Unredacted Version of Apple Inc.'s Motion for an Exceptional Case Finding and an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Against Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, # 6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 7 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Attorneys Fees and Nontaxable Costs)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted/Sealed Version of EXHIBITS C and D to the Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 254 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore iso Apple's Admin Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 253 BILL OF COSTS by Apple Inc.. Objections due by 2/18/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett iso Apple Inc.'s Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Corbett Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Corbett Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Corbett Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Corbett Declaration)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING re 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of December 18, 2015 Hearing Transcript filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 28, 2016 Filing 251 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl From Testifying at Trial (Re-Filed Pursuant to Court's Order at Dkt. No. 235) filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 2/11/2016. Replies due by 2/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett iso Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 1/28/2016) Modified on 1/29/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2016 Filing 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of December 18, 2015 Hearing Transcript filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Unredacted Version of December 18, 2015 Transcript of Proceedings)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 1/27/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 249 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Christine Kerba Corbett (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 248 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 ***Trial and related deadlines terminated. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 247 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (filed UNDER SEAL) Granting 182 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 180 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying 188 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts; and Denying 185 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Aylus's Experts. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2016. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2016: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (slhS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 182 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 180 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying 188 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts; and Denying 185 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Aylus's Experts. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 AMENDED ORDER re 237 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (For motion to seal Docket #205). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 AMENDED ORDER re 236 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (for Motion to Seal Docket No. 188). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 232 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/15, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 231 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016. (Related documents(s) 231 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aylus Networks, Inc. for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
December 21, 2015 Filing 230 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motions Hearing held on 12/18/2015 (P's Partial MSJ #180/D's MSJ #182/D's Motion to Strike #185/Motion to Exclude Opinion #221/Status). Court took matter under submission and to issue order. Parties are encouraged to contact Judge Infanti to schedule a further mediation.Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney Amar Thakur and Joseph Martin. Defendant Attorney Erik Fuehrer, Robert Buergi, Mark Fowler, Christine Corbett, Jon Hicks and Kevin Moore. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2015)
December 14, 2015 Filing 229 Statement of Recent Decision in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl From Testifying at Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 10, 2015 Filing 228 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting motion hearings and status conference from 1:30 p.m. to 2:30 p.m. on 12/18/15 in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment, 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, 185 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 7, 2015 Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting motions and status conference from 12/10/15 to Friday 12/18/15 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/11/2015. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment, 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, 185 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
December 3, 2015 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FACT DISCOVERY filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 224 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING FACT DISCOVERY filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 223 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 221 and 222) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. Nos. 221 and 222))(Related document(s) 221 ) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 222 REPLY (re 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Redacted Reply In Support of Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts (CORRECTION OF DKT. 221-3) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 221 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3*** FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Reply In Support of Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Ecperts (Redacted), # 4 Reply In Support of Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Ecperts (Highlighted), # 5 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2 (under seal), # 8 Exhibit 3 (under seal), # 9 Exhibit 4 (under seal), # 10 Exhibit 5 (under seal))(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 11/23/2015) Modified on 11/24/2015 (fff, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2015 Filing 220 REPLY (re 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 219 REPLY (re 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 218 REPLY (re 185 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit J to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit K to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 216 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. No. 212))(Related document(s) 212 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 215 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. No. 205))(Related document(s) 205 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 214 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 10, 2015 Filing 213 EXHIBITS re 208 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,, 206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[206.5] and #[208-5] filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 208 , 206 ) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 212 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Aylus's Opposition to Apple's Daubert Motion (Redacted), # 4 Aylus's Opposition to Apple's Daubert Motion (Unredacted), # 5 Declaration of Dr. James R. Kearl (Redacted), # 6 Declaration of Dr. James R. Kearl (Unredacted), # 7 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Aylus's Opposition to Apple's Daubert Motion, # 8 Exhibit 1 (under seal), # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3 (under seal), # 11 Exhibit 4 (under seal), # 12 Exhibit 5 (under seal), # 13 Exhibit 6 (under seal), # 14 Exhibit 7 (under seal), # 15 Exhibit 8 (under seal), # 16 Exhibit 9 (under seal), # 17 Exhibit 10 (under seal), # 18 Exhibit 11, # 19 Exhibit 12, # 20 Exhibit 13 (under seal), # 21 Exhibit 14 (under seal), # 22 Exhibit 15 (under seal), # 23 Exhibit 16 (under seal), # 24 Exhibit 17 (under seal), # 25 Exhibit 18 (under seal))(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 210 RESPONSE (re 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Buergi In Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Robert Buergi Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Robert Buergi Declaration)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 209 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 208 RESPONSE (re 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) - Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine K. Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5Blocked Per Chambers. Please See Docket Number 213 for the Public Viewing of Exhibit D Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Declaration of Lynne Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 12 Exhibit A, # 13 Declaration of James Malackowski in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 14 Exhibit 1, # 15 Proposed Order Denying Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore In Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Robert Buergi in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Robert Buergi in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 206 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to FIle Documents Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 5 Blocked Per Chambers. Please see docket number 213 for the Public Viewing of Exhibit D Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit E to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H to Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 11 Redacted Version of Declaration of Lynne Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 12 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Lynne Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Lynne Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Lynne Weber, Ph.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 15 Redacted Version of Declaration of James Malackowski in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 16 Unredacted Version of Declaration of James Malackowski in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Malackowski in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Malackowski in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Aylus's Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Declaration ISO Summary Judgment Opposition, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 204 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 203 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore iso Admin Motion, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit F, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit F, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit F)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 202 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RENEWED Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (UNREDACTED-SEALED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B to the Declaration of Christine Corbett Regarding Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re The First Supplemental Expert Report of Dan Schonfeld (Dkt. No. 177) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 201 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 178 Discovery Letter Brief. Aylus' request to strike Section XII of Dr. Polish's report is DENIED.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 200 Declaration of Christine Corbett Regarding Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re The First Supplemental Expert Report Of Dan Schonfeld (Dkt. No. 177) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 199 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RENEWED Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore iso Apple's Renewed Admin Motion, # 2 Declaration of Christine Corbett Re Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re the First Suppl Expert Report of Dan Schonfeld (Dkt. No. 177), # 3 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Administrative Motion, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 198 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice. Renewed motion due by November 4, 2015.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 197 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 177 Discovery Letter Brief. Apple's request to strike the supplemental report is denied.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 196 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice. Apple shall re-file its motion by no later than November 2, 2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 195 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. No. 190))(Related document(s) 190 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 192 Declaration in Support, UNREDACTED/SEALED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE CORBETT REGARDING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE THE FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT OF DAN SCHONFELD (DKT. NO. 177) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 193 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Admin Motion to File Documents Under Seal (Dkt. No. 188))(Related document(s) 188 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 192 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of 177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re the First Supplemental Expert Report of Dan Schonfeld (Dkt. No. 177) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Corbett Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Corbett Declaration)(Related document(s) 177 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 191 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore iso Administrative Motion, # 2 Declaration of Christine Corbett Re Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Schonfeld Report, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 22, 2015 Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn ISO Joint Discoverry Letter Brief (Dkt. 178), # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER re 178 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc., 177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/21/2015. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 188 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts (Filed Under Seal), # 4 Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts (Redacted), # 5 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Proposed Order Granting Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Apple's Experts)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 186 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of 185 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 185 ) (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 185 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/2/2015. Replies due by 11/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik Fuehrer in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to FIle Documents Under Seal, # 2 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 4 Redacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 5 Unredacted Version of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Damages Expert James Kearl and to Preclude Dr. Kearl from Testifying at Trial, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 14 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 16 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 18 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 20 Redacted Version of Exhibit I, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 183 Declaration of Robert Buergi in Support of 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Buergi Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Buergi Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Buergi Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Buergi Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Buergi Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Buergi Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Buergi Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Buergi Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Buergi Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Buergi Declaration)(Related document(s) 182 ) (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/2/2015. Replies due by 11/9/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 181 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Summary Judgment Motion, # 4 Unredacted Version of Summary Judgment Motion, # 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 2, # 6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 2, # 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 3, # 8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 7, # 10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 7, # 11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 8, # 12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex. 8)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Filing 180 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/9/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E1, # 7 Exhibit E2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Proposed Order, # 16 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 10/19/2015) Modified on 10/20/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2015 Filing 179 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 08/20/15, before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 11:33 - 12:33. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 176 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2016. (Related documents(s) 176 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 178 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
October 12, 2015 Filing 176 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Hicks, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 175 Order by Edward M. Chen granting 174 Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery Cutoff.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 29, 2015 Filing 174 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Lee Sohn (Sohn, Joshua) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 REDACTED ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS re 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/28/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015) Modified on 9/9/2015 (sisS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER - Apple shall lodge its proposed redactions within 7 days. If proposed redactions are not received within 7 days, the order will be available on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 8/28/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph B. Martin (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 8/20/2015. re 145 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. FTR Time 11:33-12:33. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2015)
August 19, 2015 Filing 168 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/28/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 165 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2015. (Related documents(s) 165 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 167 CLERK'S NOTICE- Motion hearing re: 145 will be heard in Courtroom 3 on the 3rd Floor, 1301 Clay St., Oakland, CA.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 14, 2015 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 165 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aylus Networks, Inc. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 162 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 161 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 156 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 24, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Conference/Dispositive motions set for 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 12/3/2015. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Daubert Motion Deadline filed by Apple Inc. Status Report due by 12/3/2015. Status Conference reset for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. MSJs and Daubert motionto be heard on 12/10/15 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 24, 2015 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Daubert Motion Deadline filed by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
July 23, 2015 Filing 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Aylus's Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions (Redacted), # 4 Aylus's Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions (Unredacted), # 5 Exhibit A to Cooper Declaration (Redacted), # 6 Manual Filing Notification for Unredacted Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit F to Cooper Declaration (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit F to Cooper Declaration (Unedacted), # 9 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal))(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 157 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 21, 2015 Filing 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Reply In Supported of Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (REDACTED), # 4 Reply In Supported of Motion For Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions (UNREDACTED), # 5 Declaration of Daniel Lanovaz (REDACTED), # 6 Declaration of Daniel Lanovaz (UNREDACTED), # 7 Declaration of Amar L. Thakur, # 8 Exhibit 1, # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 4, # 12 Exhibit 5, # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER DENYING 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2015 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Lead trial counsel to meet and confer regarding potential amendments to Aylus' infringement contentions. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/16/2015. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 152 RESPONSE (re 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Opposition to Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik Fuehrer, # 2 Exhibit A (Submitted Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order Denying Aylus's Motion for Leave to Amend)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion, # 3 Redacted Version of Defendant Apple's Opposition to Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions, # 4 Unredacted Version of Defendant Apple's Opposition to Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Erik Fuehrer iso Defendant Apple's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Erik Fuehrer iso Defendant Apple's Opposition, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Fuehrer Declaration, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Fuehrer Declaration)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 10, 2015 Filing 150 Renotice motion hearing re 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 7/14/2015. (Related document(s) 145 ) (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER TERMINATING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF, see 143 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/08/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REFERRING MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE WESTMORE: 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/7/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
July 6, 2015 Filing 147 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
July 6, 2015 Filing 146 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Related document(s) 145 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 145 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions (REDACTED VERSION), # 4 Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions (UNREDACTED VERSION), # 5 Declaration of William O. Cooper In Support of Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Proposed Order Granting Aylus Networks, Inc.'s Motion For Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 Filing 144 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal)(Related document(s) 143 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Aylus's Rule 30(b)(6) Topic No. 11 (Redacted Version), # 3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Aylus's Rule 30(b)(6) Topic No. 11 (Unredacted Version), # 4 Proposed Order)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Cannom for Defendant Apple Inc. (Cannom, Hannah) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 141 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore Denying 138 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal.(kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/29/2015 (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2015 Filing 140 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Document Under Seal)(Related document(s) 138 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/15/2015)
June 12, 2015 Filing 139 Proposed Order re 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 11, 2015 Filing 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Letter Brief Regarding Inadequate Rule 30(b)(6) Testimony)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 137 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Status Conference held on 6/4/2015. Status Report due by 11/16/2015. Status Conference set for 11/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:33-10:37. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding The Taking Of Limited Party And Third Party Discovery After The Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 119 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions; and Denying 123 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/2/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 134 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding The Taking Of Limited Party And Third Party Discovery After The Fact Discovery Cutoff filed by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 133 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2015 denying 119 Motion to Amend/Correct denying 123 Motion to Stay.Court Reporter Name Ronda Aquilina. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 132 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 5/29/2015) Modified on 6/1/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2015 Filing 131 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Certain Claims of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. RE44, 412 by Aylus Networks, Inc. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 130 SEE #133 for AMENDED MINUTE ORDER. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2015. re 123 MOTION to Stay (RENEWED) Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 filed by Apple Inc., 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Apple Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc. Both motions denied. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2015) Modified on 5/28/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/1/2015 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing Status Report due by 5/29/2015. Status Conference set for 6/4/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 14, 2015 Filing 129 REPLY (re 123 MOTION to Stay (RENEWED) Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett iso Apple's Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett, # 3 Exhibit B to Supplemental Declaration of Christine Corbett)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
May 7, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 123 MOTION to Stay (RENEWED) Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412, 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Apple Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 122 Defendant's Motion to Shorten Time; setting hearing on 122 Defendant's Motion to Stay; and Continuing 119 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 127 RESPONSE (re 123 MOTION to Stay (RENEWED) Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 ) and Request For Oral Argument filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re Opposition Brief to 123 Defendant's Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/2015. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
April 28, 2015 Filing 125 RESPONSE (re 122 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple's Renewed Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 ) Opposition filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of A. Thakur ISO Aylus's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Shorten Time)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 24, 2015 Filing 124 REPLY (re 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Apple Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Supplemental) of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 123 MOTION to Stay (RENEWED) Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2015. Replies due by 5/14/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Stay of the Case Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Stay of the Case Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 23, 2015 Filing 122 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple's Renewed Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple's Renewed Motion to Stay Pending Inter Parte Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing on Apple Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Stay of the Csae Pending Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. RE44,412)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
April 17, 2015 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Apple Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions ) Opposition filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Martin ISO Aylus's Opposition to Apple's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order Denying Apple's Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions)(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER regarding Joint Discovery Letter Brief 115 . Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 04/09/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendant Apple Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/17/2015. Replies due by 4/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Corbett Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Robert Buergi in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions, # 5 Exhibit A to Buergi Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B to Buergi Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 31, 2015 Filing 118 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
March 30, 2015 Filing 117 Declaration of Kim Moore in Support of 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aylus Networks, Inc. re 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 25, 2015 Filing 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph B. Martin In Support of Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 3 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Aylus's RFP No. 43 (Redacted Version), # 4 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Aylus's RFP No. 43 (Unredacted Version))(Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 3/25/2015)
March 12, 2015 Filing 114 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 112 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
March 5, 2015 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J Blanco (Blanco, Eduardo) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 112 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
March 3, 2015 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Martin on behalf of Plaintiff Aylus Networks, Inc. (Martin, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 110 Order regarding 103 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, 109 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/25/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 109 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/4/2015. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 3/29/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/1/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/5/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Jury Selection set for 3/28/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 13, 2015 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2015. Status Report due by 5/28/2015. Status Conference set for 6/4/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. 9 court day jury trial set for 3/28/16 at 8:30 a.m.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time 11:09-11:12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER re 103 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 02/11/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
February 10, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 104 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 Filing 103 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER - CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 101 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting further CMC from 1/29/15 to 2/12/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2015. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 22, 2015 Filing 100 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 98 Regarding Patent Local Rule 3-7 Disclosure Deadline filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Patent Local Rule 3-7 Disclosure Deadline filed by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 8, 2015 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE continuing the Further Case Management Conference to 1/29/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement is due by 1/22/2015. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
December 16, 2014 Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 21, 2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 95 Transcript Order, 94 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2015. (Related documents(s) 95 , 94 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 9, 2014 Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
December 4, 2014 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aylus Networks, Inc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 11/21/2014. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Belle Ball) (mklS, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2014 Filing 92 Supplemental Brief filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Declaration Wigdor Declaration)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 10, 2014 Filing 91 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT - Supplemental Regarding Aylus's New Construction of "Serving Node" filed by Apple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying Defendant's 61 Motion to Stay (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 89 Order Claims Construction Hearing reset from 11/10/2014 to 11/21/2014 01:00 PM. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER regarding supplemental briefing and rescheduling claim construction hearing (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Aylus Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 86 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/20/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc./Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:31 - 4:16. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 83 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2015. (Related documents(s) 83 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 24, 2014 Filing 85 Brief re 55 Claim Construction Statement (Supplemental) filed byApple Inc.. (Related document(s) 55 ) (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 84 REPLY (re 61 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review of United States Patent No. RE44,412 ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christine Corbett)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aylus Networks, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 63 Motion for Leave to File; denying 65 Motion to Strike ; denying 67 Motion to Strike ; denying 69 Motion to Strike and vacating 11/4/14 hearing on Motion to stay (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 81 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 10/20/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court denied motions to strike #65, 67 and 69. 10/22/14 hearing vacated. 11/4/14 Hearing on Defendant's motion to stay vacated. Court to issue order on paper. (Date Filed: 10/20/2014). (Recording #FTR 2:31-4:16.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 80 REPLY (re 67 MOTION to Strike 55 Claim Construction Statement, 57 Affidavit, ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 79 REPLY (re 69 MOTION to Strike 62 Claim Construction Statement,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Undisclosed Documents in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief ) filed byApple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 78 REPLY (re 65 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief ) filed byApple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 77 RESPONSE (re 69 MOTION to Strike 62 Claim Construction Statement,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Undisclosed Documents in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 Filing 76 RESPONSE (re 67 MOTION to Strike 55 Claim Construction Statement, 57 Affidavit, ) Opposition to Aylus's Motion to Strike Apple's Non-Disclosed Claim Construction Evidence filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett, # 2 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Corbett Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Corbett Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Corbett Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 15, 2014 Filing 75 RESPONSE (re 65 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Entry of Equipment Into the Court Pursuant to General Order No. 58 for the Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 . Responses due by 10/15/2014. Replies due by 10/16/2014. Motions (#65, 67 and 69) Hearing set for 10/22/2014 12:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 72 RESPONSE (re 63 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Claim Construction Brief ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 71 RESPONSE (re 61 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review of United States Patent No. RE44,412 ) filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 70 RESPONSE (re 64 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus Reply Claim Construction Brief ) Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 Filing 69 MOTION to Strike 62 Claim Construction Statement,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Undisclosed Documents in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/28/2014. Replies due by 11/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett iso Apple's Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion to Strike)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 67 MOTION to Strike 55 Claim Construction Statement, 57 Affidavit, , 65 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief, 64 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 13, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to Strike 55 Claim Construction Statement, 57 Affidavit, filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Responses due by 10/27/2014. Replies due by 11/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Entry of Equipment Into the Court Pursuant to General Order No. 58 for the Technology Tutorial and Claim Construction Hearing filed by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2014. Replies due by 10/30/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple's Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Apple's Motion to Strike Expert Declaration of Daniel J. Wigdor in Support of Aylus Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Erik Fuehrer iso Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Fuehrer Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Fuehrer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Fuehrer Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Fuehrer Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Apple's Motion)(Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/10/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2014 Filing 62 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Reply Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cooper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Affidavit Wigdor Expert Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 30, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION to Stay the Case Pending Inter Partes Review of United States Patent No. RE44,412 filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/14/2014. Replies due by 10/21/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Christine Corbett iso Motion for Stay, # 2 Exhibit A to Corbett Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Corbett Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Corbett Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Corbett Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Corbett Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Apple Inc.'s Motion for Stay)(Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 26, 2014 Filing 60 EXHIBITS re 56 Affidavit, Corrected Exhibits 1 and 3 to Declaration of Robert Buergi in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 56 ) (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 59 Proposed Order re 55 Claim Construction Statement by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 58 AFFIDAVIT re 55 Claim Construction Statement Of Dr. Nathaniel Polish, PH.D. in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19, # 2 Exhibit 20, # 3 Exhibit 21)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT re 55 Claim Construction Statement Of Universal Plug and Play Specification Author Sho Kou in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Exhibit 13, # 5 Exhibit 14, # 6 Exhibit 15, # 7 Exhibit 16, # 8 Exhibit 17, # 9 Exhibit 18)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT re 55 Claim Construction Statement Of Robert Buergi in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 25, 2014 Filing 55 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT (RESPONSIVE) OF APPLE INC. filed by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
September 11, 2014 Filing 54 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Aylus' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William O. Cooper, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (msr, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 53 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 08/27/14, before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:14 - 1:30. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 52 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2014. (Related documents(s) 52 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 52 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Aylus Networks, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/27/2014 before The Honorable Edward Chen (Date Filed: 8/29/2014). (FTR recording: 1:14- 1:30.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2014)
August 21, 2014 Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Further Joint Case Management Statement filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 12, 2014 Filing 49 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/27/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
July 30, 2014 Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE resetting Tutorial Hearing from 10/14/2014 to 10/20/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing reset from 10/27/2014 to 11/10/2014 02:30 PM. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 28, 2014 Filing 47 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER - re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 8, 2014 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ESI STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ESI Stipulation filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 6, 2014 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ESI Stipulation filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 4/6/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 42 Answer to Amended Complaint 37 Amended Complaint (Answer to Second Amended Complaint) byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H Hicks (Hicks, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Regarding Certain PLR Requirements filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/18/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 39 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Regarding Certain PLR Requirements filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Apple Inc.. Filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 re 34 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Deadlines. Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to Stat filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 34 Stipulation and Order,,,, Terminate Deadlines,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof Stipulation for Apple's Motion to Dismiss filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Apple's Motion to Dismiss (Docket # 31) filed by Aylus Networks, Inc., ***Deadlines terminated. 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Apple's Motion to Dismiss (Docket # 31) filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Apple's Motion to Dismiss (Docket # 31), 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 3/6/2014. Replies due by 3/13/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 27, 2014 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Apple's Motion to Dismiss (Docket # 31) filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 32 Proposed Order re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof by Apple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Aylus's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State Claim, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/27/2014. Replies due by 3/6/2014. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 30 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/13/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 2/13/2014). Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 10/27/2014 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 10/14/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #905-913.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/13/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 28 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 Filing 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Aylus Networks, Inc. filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 26 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc.. Filed byAylus Networks, Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 1/27/2014) Modified on 1/28/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2014 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aylus Networks, Inc. re 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options Proof of Service (Cooper, William) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William Owen Cooper (Cooper, William) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple Inc.. (Fowler, Mark) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
December 11, 2013 Filing 19 Letter from Amardeep Thakur Responding to Clerk's Notice dated 11/27/13. (Thakur, Amardeep) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aylus Networks, Inc. re 15 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Barza, Harold) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 17 Letter from Erik Fuehrer Responding to Clerk's Notice - 11/27/2013 Letter From Judge Chen. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE - LETTER FROM JUDGE CHEN RE; CONSENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/27/13. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Further Extend the Time for Defendant Apple Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Approving re 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 12 STIPULATION To Extend the Time For Defendant Apple Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff Aylus Network, Inc.'s Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Apple Inc.. (Corbett, Christine) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 11, 2013 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013. (Barza, Harold) (Filed on 10/11/2013) Modified on 10/15/2013 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/11/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aylus Networks, Inc... (Barza, Harold) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Barza, Harold) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aylus Networks, Inc. (Barza, Harold) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-8067556.). Filed by Aylus Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barza, Harold) (Filed on 10/9/2013) Modified on 10/9/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aylus Networks, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aylus Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Harold A. Barza
Represented By: Vincent Martin Pollmeier
Represented By: Amardeep Lal Thakur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Christine Kerba Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?